This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:36:33 (UTC).

Perry et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Perry filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William H. Steele and Bert W. Milling, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Steele

Referral Judge

Bert W. Milling, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Colby Perry

Morgan Perry

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Duncan R. Crow, I

Attorney at L D Holt & Associates, LLC

7451 Spanish Fort Blvd

Spanish Fort, AL 36527

L. D. Holt

P.O. Box 27

Bay Minette, AL 36507

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Summons Issued as to Scottsdale Insurance Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#15

(#15) Second Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) Modified on 2/6/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#14

(#14) ORDER striking document 12. Plaintiffs are ordered to file and serve a proper second amended complaint on or before 2/6/23. They are ordered to show cause on or before 2/6/23 for their failure to comply with the Court's previous order. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/23. (cmj) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of filing proposed summons for Scottsdale Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs (Holt, L.) Modified on 2/7/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#12

(#12) (THIS DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC. 14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) Modified on 2/2/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Amend Complaint as plaintiff may amend once as a matter of course within 21 days after service of a responsive pleading; denying #10 Motion to Remand to State Court as set out; granting #9 Motion to Substitute Party with the Court construing this motion as a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint that names only Scottsdale as a defendant. Plaintiffs are to file and serve their second amended complaint by 1/31/23. The only changes authorized by this order are the deletion of Nationwide as a defendant and the removal of the state court style (doc. 8 at 1-2), which is stricken.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/23. (cmj) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION to Substitute Party filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Holt, L.) Modified on 1/26/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#8

(#8) Proposed Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) Modified on 1/26/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

6 #1

Consent to Mag

#6

(#6) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/13/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/25/23. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #2 Order to Show Cause filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for defendant's failure to file a responsive pleading. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2023.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/20/23. (cmj) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Scottsdale Insurance Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) Modified on 2/6/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER striking document 12. Plaintiffs are ordered to file and serve a proper second amended complaint on or before 2/6/23. They are ordered to show cause on or before 2/6/23 for their failure to comply with the Court's previous order. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/23. (cmj) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of filing proposed summons for Scottsdale Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs (Holt, L.) Modified on 2/7/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) (THIS DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC. 14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) Modified on 2/2/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Amend Complaint as plaintiff may amend once as a matter of course within 21 days after service of a responsive pleading; denying #10 Motion to Remand to State Court as set out; granting #9 Motion to Substitute Party with the Court construing this motion as a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint that names only Scottsdale as a defendant. Plaintiffs are to file and serve their second amended complaint by 1/31/23. The only changes authorized by this order are the deletion of Nationwide as a defendant and the removal of the state court style (doc. 8 at 1-2), which is stricken.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/23. (cmj) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #8 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Judge Steele. (cmj) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Amend Complaint , #9 MOTION to Substitute Party , #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Judge Steele (cmj) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Substitute Party filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Holt, L.) Modified on 1/26/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) Modified on 1/26/2023 (cmj). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holt, L.) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/13/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/25/23. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Nationwide's Response to Order to Show Cause #3 filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Steele, William) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #3 Response to Order to Show Cause to Judge Steele. (cmj) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #2 Order to Show Cause filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Jones, Allan) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for defendant's failure to file a responsive pleading. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2023.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/20/23. (cmj) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3131514, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Jones, Allan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2023: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjr). (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less