This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 09:53:01 (UTC).

Perrine v. eTN Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Perrine filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against eTN Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judge overseeing this case is ROM TRADER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00408

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas Lee Perrine

Defendants

eTN Corporation

Juergen Steinmetz

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Irving Gafni

Attorney at Gafni & Levin, LLP

11620 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 850

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Kerry S. Culpepper

75-170 Hualalai Roadsuite B204

Kailua Kona, HI 96740

Joshua Jungho Lee

Attorney at Culpepper IP, LLLC

75-170 Hualalai Road Suite B204

Kailua-Kona, HI 96740

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Jungho Lee on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation. (Lee, Joshua) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#17

(#17) CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Douglas Lee Perrine, Defendants Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation Please continue to reflect civil case number CV 21-00408 RT on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#16

RESTRICTED

14 #2

Certificate of Service

14 #1

Declaration of Counsel

14 #14

Main Document

#13

RESTRICTED

12 #1

Certificate of Service

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry S. Culpepper on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Lee Perrine. eTN Corporation served on 10/17/2021. (jo) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Lee Perrine. Juergen Steinmetz served on 10/17/2021. (jo) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#8

#7

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Jungho Lee on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation. (Lee, Joshua) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Douglas Lee Perrine, Defendants Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation Please continue to reflect civil case number CV 21-00408 RT on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent Election Form (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EO: On 10/29/21, Defendants filed [ECF #14 ] (Opposed) Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, to Continue the Scheduling Conference and for an Early Settlement Conference ("Motion"). The Court elects to decide this matter without further briefing and without a hearing pursuant to LR7.1(c). For good cause, the Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows:1.GRANTED as to the request for a 60-day extension to respond to the Complaint. Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED from 11/8/21 to 1/7/22. 2.GRANTED as to the request to continue the scheduling conference. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 12/13/21 at 9:00 a.m. to 1/19/22 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Scheduling Conference Statements are due 1/12/22. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:Dial 1-888-363-4735.Access Code 2070326.3.DENIED as to request for an Early Settlement Conference. Denial is without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER) (afe) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Defendants Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent Election Form (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry S. Culpepper on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation on behalf of Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Lee Perrine. eTN Corporation served on 10/17/2021. (jo) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Lee Perrine. Juergen Steinmetz served on 10/17/2021. (jo) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, and #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright have been served by First Class Mail on October 12, 2021 to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jni) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Juergen Steinmetz, eTN Corporation. (jni) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/13/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00408 RT on all further pleadings. (jni) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Douglas Perrine Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Copyright Douglas Perrine. (Gafni, Adam) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons (Proposed) (Gafni, Adam) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2591004.), filed by Douglas Perrine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gafni, Adam) Docket Text Modified on 10/12/2021 (jni) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kerry S. Culpepper