This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:17:58 (UTC).

Pernick v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Pernick filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-04028

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kara Pernick

Defendants

Walmart Inc.

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Walmart, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian O Marty

Attorney at Shindler Anderson Goplerud & Weese PC

5015 Grand Ridge Drive, Suite 100

West Des Moines, IA 50265

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin M Weston

Attorney at Lederer Weston & Craig PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 9:00 AM in Sioux City before Judge CJ Williams. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2022. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 8/12/21. (ksy) Modified trial location on 8/12/2021 (ksy). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#11

(#11) CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION and Protective Order granting #8 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/10/2021. (jag) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 9/10/2021 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 11/12/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 12/13/2021. Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 2/14/2022. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 3/14/2022. Discovery due by 5/16/2022. Motions due by 6/16/2022. Trial Ready Deadline 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/10/2021. (jag) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#9

(#9) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/9/2021. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (jag) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

8 #1

Protective Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc (Attachments: #1 Protective Order) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/6/2021. (jjh) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#5

(#5) DOCKET Annotation: Please find New Removal Case Packet Attached. (mmc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#4

(#4) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Kara Pernick. (mmc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc. (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc..(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #3

Local Rule 81.A Statement

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Woodbury County District Court, case number LACV197597. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3488354), filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. Scheduling Report due by 9/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 9:00 AM in Sioux City before Judge CJ Williams. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2022. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 8/12/21. (ksy) Modified trial location on 8/12/2021 (ksy). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION and Protective Order granting #8 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/10/2021. (jag) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 9/10/2021 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 11/12/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 12/13/2021. Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 2/14/2022. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 3/14/2022. Discovery due by 5/16/2022. Motions due by 6/16/2022. Trial Ready Deadline 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/10/2021. (jag) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/9/2021. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (jag) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc (Attachments: #1 Protective Order) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/6/2021. (jjh) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET Annotation: Please find New Removal Case Packet Attached. (mmc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Kara Pernick. (mmc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJudge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc. (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc..(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Woodbury County District Court, case number LACV197597. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3488354), filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. Scheduling Report due by 9/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Weston