This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2019 at 06:19:13 (UTC).

PERNIA v. BICKHAM

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 a Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee case was filed by PERNIA against BICKHAM in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00164

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

HUGH LAWSON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA

Respondent

Warden BICKHAM

Not Yet Classified

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-3-19. (rcg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-30-19. (jdl) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sheriff Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Aska Declaration)(SHOEMAKER, BOWEN) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail Returned - #3 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA, #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #4 Order for Response (Habeas Petition) sent to Jose Daniel Perez Pernia Irwin County Detention returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Returned Envelope - Stewart Detention) (rlw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-3-19. (rcg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by BICKHAM (HELMICK, AMELIA) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • REMARK: Notified by telephone that Petitioner has been transferred to Adams County Correctional Center. He is mailing in a change of address. (rlw) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • REMARK: Notified by telephone that Petitioner has been transferred to Stewart Detention Center. He is mailing in change of address today. (sbd) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-30-19. (jdl) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA (rlw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA. ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 42245.) (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Envelope)(rlw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.