This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2019 at 07:12:09 (UTC).

Perlock v. Barr et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Perlock filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03792

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger P. Perlock

Defendants

Illinois State Police

William P. Barr

Thomas E. Brandon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David G. Sigale

Attorney at Law Firm of David G. Sigale, P.C.

799 Roosevelt Road, Suite 207

Glen Ellyn, IL 60137

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss #4 is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The status hearing set for 8/8/19 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion to dismiss #4 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Roger P. Perlock to dismiss voluntarily (F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Sigale, David) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 8/8/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Roger P. Perlock; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15904675. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Police Master Sergeant is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David G. Sigale