3:23-CV-00502
02/02/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Other Labor
William H. Orrick
Quincy Griffin Perkins
Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.
James R Hawkins
Ava Issary
Gregory Mauro
Lauren, Esq. Falk
Michael Calvo
Lauren Ashley Ziegler
Rafael N. Tumanyan
Tanner Hendershot
Mara D Curtis
(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 5/2/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2023). Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Lauren Falk. Defendant Attorney: Mara D. Curtis. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2023) (Entered: 05/03/2023)
(#19) Joint Rule 26(f) Report Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. and Quincy Griffin Perkins (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 4/25/2023) Modified on 4/26/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2023)
(#18) NOTICE of Related Cases by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 4/21/2023) Modified on 4/24/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2023)
(#17) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mauro, Gregory) (Filed on 4/20/2023) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Ashley Ziegler (Ziegler, Lauren) (Filed on 4/17/2023) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
(#15) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 4/12/2023) (Entered: 04/12/2023)
(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 02/16/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2023. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/15/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/202 3. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
(#5) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) Modified on 2/3/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#4) Request for Judicial Notice re #1 Notice of Removal, filed byRyder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Ryder System, Inc., Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet
Declaration of Delores Clark in Support of Notice of Removal of Action
Declaration of Kassie Bazan in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of
Main Document
Docket(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 5/2/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2023). Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Lauren Falk. Defendant Attorney: Mara D. Curtis. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2023) (Entered: 05/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) CLERKS NOTICE RE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 05/02/2023 at 2:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023) (Entered: 05/01/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) Joint Rule 26(f) Report Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. and Quincy Griffin Perkins (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 4/25/2023) Modified on 4/26/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) NOTICE of Related Cases by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 4/21/2023) Modified on 4/24/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mauro, Gregory) (Filed on 4/20/2023) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Ashley Ziegler (Ziegler, Lauren) (Filed on 4/17/2023) (Entered: 04/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 4/12/2023) (Entered: 04/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 02/16/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2023. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/15/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) ***Disregard, please see docket no. 14** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 02/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023) Modified on 2/16/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ryder System, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/202 3. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Ryder System, Inc., Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer to Removal Complaint filed in Alameda County Superior Court on 2/2/2023 by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2023) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) Modified on 2/3/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Request for Judicial Notice re #1 Notice of Removal, filed byRyder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ryder System, Inc. for Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court - Rene C. Davidson Courthous ewith jury demand. Their case number is 22CV021674. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17955088). Filed by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kassie Bazan in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Declaration of Delores Clark in Support of Notice of Removal of Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curtis, Mara) (Filed on 2/2/2023) Modified on 2/3/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2023)
[-] Read Less