This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:45:16 (UTC).

Perkins v. Commonwealth of Virginia

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Perkins filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Commonwealth of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roderick C. Young and M. Hannah Lauck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roderick C. Young

Presiding Judge

M. Hannah Lauck

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Johnnie Darnell Perkins

Staunton, VA 24402

Respondent

Commonwealth of Virginia

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Transferring Action to Western District of Virginia) - It is hereby ORDERED: That this action is FILED solely for the administrative convenience of the Clerk; The action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. The Clerk of this Court is directed to transfer all pleadings filed in this case to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 12/09/2019. (Copy mailed to Petitioner) (smej, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Letter

1 #1

Unmarked Exhibits

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnnie Darnell Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Unmarked Exhibits, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope) (smej, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2019) (smej, ). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase transferred to District of Western District of Virginia. Original file, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. Case Number in WDVA 7:19cv817. (smej, ) Modified on 12/9/2019 (smej, ). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM ORDER (Transferring Action to Western District of Virginia) - It is hereby ORDERED: That this action is FILED solely for the administrative convenience of the Clerk; The action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. The Clerk of this Court is directed to transfer all pleadings filed in this case to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 12/09/2019. (Copy mailed to Petitioner) (smej, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnnie Darnell Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Unmarked Exhibits, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope) (smej, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2019) (smej, ). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.