This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:50:35 (UTC).

Perkins et al v. Mak Transportation, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Perkins filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mak Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tom S. Lee and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tom S. Lee

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kiara S. Perkins

Chelsea M. Thadison

Ravan N. Wilson

Mary Trunner

Defendants

Karamjeet Singh

Doe Defendant 1

Doe Defendants 3-10

Mak Transportation, Inc.

Doe Defendant 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Warren L. Martin, Jr.

Attorney at WARREN L. MARTIN, JR., PA

351 Edgewood Terrace Drive

Jackson, MS 39206

Defendant Attorney

Michael R. Kelly

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL - Jackson

P.O. Box 1084, 4400 Old Canton Road, Suite 400 (39211)

Jackson, MS 39215

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Doe Defendant 1, Doe Defendant 2, Doe Defendants 3-10, Mak Transportation, Inc., Karamjeet Singh ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643053768), filed by Ravan N. Wilson, Mary Trunner, Kiara S. Perkins, Chelsea M. Thadison. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2019) (PKM). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mak Transportation, Inc. (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

1 #1

Attachment

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Mak Transportation, Inc., Karamjeet Singh. (MGB) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mak Transportation, Inc., Karamjeet Singh.(Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mak Transportation, Inc. (Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mak Transportation, Inc., Karamjeet Singh.(Kelly, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Mak Transportation, Inc., Karamjeet Singh. (MGB) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Doe Defendant 1, Doe Defendant 2, Doe Defendants 3-10, Mak Transportation, Inc., Karamjeet Singh ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643053768), filed by Ravan N. Wilson, Mary Trunner, Kiara S. Perkins, Chelsea M. Thadison. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2019) (PKM). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.