This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2023 at 08:09:19 (UTC).

Perket v. CCRI, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Perket filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CCRI, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany Perket

Defendant

CCRI, Inc. an Oregon corporation doing business as Haven Spa Pool & Hearth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D. Ostrander

William A. Drew

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan W. Monson

Michael G. McClory

Nicole A.W. Abercrombie

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS: Signed on 5/26/2022 by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#40

(#40) Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#38

(#38) Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Tiffany Perket against CCRI, Inc.. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#36

(#36) FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #32 ) should be GRANTED with leave to amend for Plaintiff. Scheduling Order The Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due within 14 days. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. DATED this 31st day of March, 2022, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#35

(#35) Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support #32 Oral Argument requested. Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#34

(#34) Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support #32 . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#32

(#32) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support. Oral Argument requested. Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

21 #1

Exhibit (A) Haven's Reply to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant Keck'

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) STIPULATED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS: Signed on 5/26/2022 by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2022

Docket(#39) 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Melissa Aubin. (pjg) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Tiffany Perket against CCRI, Inc.. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) ORDER referring Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #32 should be GRANTED #36 to Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #32 ) should be GRANTED with leave to amend for Plaintiff. Scheduling Order The Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due within 14 days. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. DATED this 31st day of March, 2022, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support #32 Oral Argument requested. Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support #32 . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support #32 is taken under advisement as of 1/24/2022. Request for oral argument shall be considered in due course. (pjg) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support. Oral Argument requested. Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
03/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Motion to Remand to State Court #8 is taken under advisement as of 5/26/2021. Request for oral argument shall be considered in due course. (pjg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Declaration of Suzie Fujioka . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #8 .) (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Certificate of Service by CCRI, Inc. Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Deadline for defendant CCRI to file a response to plaintiff's complaint is extended to 3/9/2021. (pjg) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Declaration of Jon W. Monson in Support of Defendant CCRI's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by CCRI, Inc.. (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/17/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/19/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/19/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV01417 from Multnomah County Civil Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7902299 issued.. Filed by CCRI, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Monson, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less