This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2021 at 10:58:46 (UTC).

Perket v. Keck

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Perket filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Keck. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01362

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany Perket

Defendant

Audrey Gene Keck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D. Ostrander

William A. Drew

Defendant Attorney

Andrew D. Glascock

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) Amended Complaint . Filed by Tiffany Perket against Audrey Gene Keck. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Answer to #4 Amended Complaint . Filed by Audrey Gene Keck. (Glascock, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#8

(#8) Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#10

(#10) Stipulated Motion for Order . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

11/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Stipulated Motion for Order . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

Docket(#9) MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held by telephone on 11/9/2021 with Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. Parties are to confer and submit a stipulated scheduling order. John Ostrander present as counsel for plaintiff. Andrew Glascock present as counsel for defendant. (pjg) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Tiffany Perket. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2021

Docket(#7) Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Telephone Rule 16 Conference is SET for Tuesday, November 9, 2021 at 11:30AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's conference call information shall be provided to the parties by separate sealed entry. (pjg) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Answer to #4 Amended Complaint . Filed by Audrey Gene Keck. (Glascock, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Response to Amended Complaint #4 is due by 10/25/2021. (pjg) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Amended Complaint . Filed by Tiffany Perket against Audrey Gene Keck. (Ostrander, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Order. Consistent with the F&R, this Court directs the clerk to sever the claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Haven from the claim asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Keck. Defendant Haven shall remain the sole defendant in Case No. 3:21-cv-00251-AC. This Court directs the clerk to open a separate civil action by Plaintiff against Defendant Keck, assign the new case to Judge Acosta, and file a copy of the Complaint in the new case along with a copy of this F&R. This Court directs Plaintiff to file amended complaints in both this action and the new action alleging claims against only the sole defendant in each case within thirty days of the date of the Order. Signed on 9/15/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV01417 from Multnomah County Circuit Court.. (ecp) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less