This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2020 at 09:15:56 (UTC).

PERIPHAGEN, INC. v. KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 PERIPHAGEN, INC filed an Other lawsuit against KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Schwab and Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00646

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Arthur J. Schwab

Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

PERIPHAGEN, INC.

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Claimants

KRISH S. KRISHNAN

SUMA KRISHNAN

KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC.

David Krisky

James Wechuck

3Rd Party Defendants and Defendants

David Krisky

James Wechuck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert L. Byer

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

600 Grant Street, Suite 5010

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Patrick C Gallagher

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1875 Nw Corporate Blvd., Suite 300

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Rachel Good

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

600 Grant Street, Suite 5010

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Anthony J. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110

Evan J. Muller

190 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Michael R. Gottfried

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Barbara A Fiacco

Attorney at Foley Hoag

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210

Thomas C. Wolski

Attorney at The Webb Law Firm

One Gateway Center, 420 Ft. Duquesne Blvd., Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

David A. DuMont

Attorney at The Webb Law Firm

One Gateway Center, 420 Ft. Duquesne Blvd., Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Sarah S Burg

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210

John C. Thomas

Attorney at The Webb Law Firm

One Gateway Center, 420 Ft. Duquesne Blvd.

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

31 #1

Exhibit 2

#31

#30

#29

28 #3

Summons for James Wechuck

28 #2

Exhibit 2

28 #1

Exhibit 1

#28

#27

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) EXHIBITS in Support of #27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (Thomas, John) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SUMA KRISHNAN. (Thomas, John) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by KRISH S. KRISHNAN. (Thomas, John) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against James Wechuck, David Krisky, filed by KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons for James Wechuck, #4 Summons for David Krisky) (Thomas, John) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC.. (Thomas, John) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jmm) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion for Sarah S. Burg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/24/20. (jad) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Barbara A. Fiacco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/24/20. (jad) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for attorney Sarah S. Burg to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5707553) by KRISH S. KRISHNAN, SUMA KRISHNAN, KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sarah S. Burg) (Fiacco, Barbara) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for attorney Barbara A. Fiacco to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5707497) by KRISH S. KRISHNAN, SUMA KRISHNAN, KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Barbara A. Fiacco) (Fiacco, Barbara) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/7/20. (jad) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Evan J. Muller to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5596832) by PERIPHAGEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Muller, Evan) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Mark R. Hornak added. (mao) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney Patrick C. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5596568) by PERIPHAGEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gallagher, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), this Court hereby recuses itself as to all matters of the above-captioned case and requests that this case be assigned to another member of the Court. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/6/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Good on behalf of PERIPHAGEN, INC.. (Good, Rachel) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to KRISH S. KRISHNAN, SUMA KRISHNAN, KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (sdp) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KRISH S. KRISHNAN, SUMA KRISHNAN, KRYSTAL BIOTECH, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5590375), filed by PERIPHAGEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. DuMont

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas C. Wolski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara A. Fiacco

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Thomas