This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 09:57:36 (UTC).

Performance Solutions, LLC v. Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Performance Solutions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are DERRICK K. WATSON and ROM TRADER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00498

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Performance Solutions, LLC

Halcyon Brand Services, Inc.

321 Holdings

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Ronald B. Johnson

Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David J. Hoftiezer

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Sasha G. Rao

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale, LLC

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ashe P. Puri

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale, LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lisa W. Munger

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Calvin E. Young

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600, Fax: 547-5880

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Nicholas R. Monlux

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 535-5700

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

Scott M. Lowry

Attorney at Lowry Blixseth APC

23632 Calabasas Rd., Ste 201

Calabasas, CA 91302

David M. Louie

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 535-5700, Fax: 535-5799

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) REPORT of Planning Meeting [Joint]. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#26

(#26) Scheduling Conference Statement [Plaintiffs Performance Solutions, LLC, 321 Holdings, and Halcyon Brand Services, Inc.]. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

25 #1

Certificate of Service

#25

(#25) Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SCOTT M. LOWRY re #18 , #22 , #23 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/15/2021. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#23

(#23) Amended Declaration re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry AMENDED Filing fee $ 300. . (Monlux, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

22 #2

[Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott M. Lowry

22 #1

Declaration of Counsel

#18

(#18) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2469458.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendants Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott M. Lowry)(Monlux, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

1 #34

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #33

Summons

1 #32

Demand for Jury Trial

1 #31

Exhibit EE

1 #30

Exhibit DD

1 #29

Exhibit CC

1 #28

Exhibit BB

1 #27

Exhibit AA

1 #1

Exhibit A

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPORT of Planning Meeting [Joint]. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Scheduling Conference Statement [Plaintiffs Performance Solutions, LLC, 321 Holdings, and Halcyon Brand Services, Inc.]. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SCOTT M. LOWRY re #18 , #22 , #23 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/15/2021. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Amended Declaration re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry AMENDED Filing fee $ 300. . (Monlux, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry AMENDED Filing fee $ 300.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendants Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott M. Lowry)(Monlux, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) EO: On 1/8/21, a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ECF #18 for attorney Scott M. Lowry was filed. The declaration of counsel [18-1] attached to the Motion is incomplete. Counsel must answer question no. 6, which requires the designation of a local, associate counsel. Counsel is directed to file an amended Motion that answers question no. 6 and indicates the name of local counsel (in addition to the name of the local law firm) by no later than 1/18/21. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Defendant Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.'s COUNTERCLAIMS against 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC by Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.'s Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Demand for Jury Trial, #40 Certificate of Service)(Louie, David) Modified on 1/11/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Defendant Ronald B. Johnson's ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint with Jury Demand by Ronald B. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Louie, David) Modified on 1/11/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2469458.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendants Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott M. Lowry)(Monlux, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Sasha G. Rao Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2453244.Lisa W. Munger appearing for Plaintiff Performance Solutions, LLC (Munger, Lisa) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Ashe P. Puri Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2453233.Lisa W. Munger appearing for Plaintiff Performance Solutions, LLC (Munger, Lisa) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa W. Munger on behalf of 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC on behalf of 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Munger, Lisa) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (jo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 1/25/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00498 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC [Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark] 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT [Against Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.; Ronald B. Johnson] against All Plaintiffs Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2450882.), filed by Performance Solutions, LLC, 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Demand for Jury Trial, #33 Summons, #34 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoftiezer, David) Modified on 11/20/2020 (jo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott M. Lowry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Louie