This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2023 at 08:43:07 (UTC).

Perez v. Wireless Advocates, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Perez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wireless Advocates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricardo Perez

Defendants

Wireless Advocates, LLC

Car Toys, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Arash Zendeh Del

Gabriel Perez

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ricardo Perez, filed.(Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ricardo Perez, filed.(Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#5

(#5) ***DOCKETED IN ERROR. See DKT #6 . Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

12/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ***DOCKETED IN ERROR. See DKT #6 . Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ricardo Perez, filed.(Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ricardo Perez, filed.(Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29157850) filed by Ricardo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less