This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 09:15:49 (UTC).

Perez v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Perez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01731

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Perez

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorge Elias Jasso

Attorney at Trujillo & Sanchez PC

500 E John Carpenter Fwy, Suite 140

Irving, TX 75062

M Andre Anziani

Attorney at Trujillo Sanchez PC

500 E John Carpenter Fwy #140

Irving, TX 76062

Defendant Attorneys

Bevan A Rhine

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Virginia Elizabeth Cox

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 12/5/2022 before Judge David C Godbey. The setting is for a one week docket. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/24/2022. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2021) (twd) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of SERVICE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY filed by Sandra Perez (Jasso, Jorge) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Cox, Virginia) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sandra Perez. (Anziani, M) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#5

(#5) Designation of lead counsel M Andre Anziani for Plaintiff Sandra Perez. (Anziani, M) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/26/2021) (twd) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D discl stmt

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C state pldgs

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B state docket

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12084457) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 12/5/2022 before Judge David C Godbey. The setting is for a one week docket. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/24/2022. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2021) (twd) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of SERVICE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY filed by Sandra Perez (Jasso, Jorge) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Cox, Virginia) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sandra Perez. (Anziani, M) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Designation of lead counsel M Andre Anziani for Plaintiff Sandra Perez. (Anziani, M) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/26/2021) (twd) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12084457) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rhine, Bevan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bevan A Rhine