This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2020 at 08:13:10 (UTC).

Perez v. Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Perez filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06126

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Roberto Perez

Respondent

Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm, P.C.

401 Park Avenue South, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Document filed by Roberto Perez..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC..(pne) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Roberto Perez..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Roberto Perez..(Ottinger, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ottinger, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

DECLARATION OF ROBERT OTTINGER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM

#1

(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21012980).Document filed by Roberto Perez. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF ROBERT OTTINGER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM, RECOGNIZE, AND ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Document filed by Roberto Perez..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC..(pne) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Roberto Perez..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party of record must be listed on the PDF 'To' section followed by 'c/o' second party name;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Roberto Perez..(Ottinger, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ottinger, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21012980).Document filed by Roberto Perez. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF ROBERT OTTINGER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM, RECOGNIZE, AND ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert W. Ottinger