This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2022 at 08:46:35 (UTC).

Perez v. Harris et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 Perez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Scott D. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julio Sosa Perez

Defendants

John Albert Harris

National Interstate Insurance Company

FreightWorks, LLC doing business as FreightWorks Transportation & Logistics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gissel M. Ferriol

Attorney at Gissel Ferriol

643 Magazine Street, Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Nathan Gaudet

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste, LLC

365 Canal Street, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Guy D. Perrier

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste

One Canal Place

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-716890. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2432695), filed by FreightWorks, LLC, John Albert Harris, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Citation to National Interstate Ins. Co., #3 Exhibit C - Long Arm Service to FreightWorks, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - "Other paper", #5 Exhibit E - Medical Bills, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Record, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Affidavit Verification)(Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Petition for Damages

1 #2

Exhibit B - Citation to National Interstate Ins. Co.

1 #3

Exhibit C - Long Arm Service to FreightWorks, LLC

1 #4

Exhibit D - "Other paper"

1 #5

Exhibit E - Medical Bills

1 #6

Exhibit F - State Court Record

1 #7

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Affidavit Verification

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Interstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group, Corporate Parent National Interstate Corporation, Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. (AFG) for National Interstate Insurance Company.. (Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FreightWorks, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FreightWorks Holdings, LLC for FreightWorks, LLC.. (Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT Certificate Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b) of Filing State Court Record by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Record)(Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

4 #1

Attachment State Court Record

#5

(#5) Letter to Attorney Gissel M. Ferriol regarding Oskar M. Perez who is Co-Counsel for party Julio Sosa Perez. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 8/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/6/2022. (KAH) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by FreightWorks, LLC, John Albert Harris, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Gaudet, Nathan) Modified on 6/14/2022 to reflect correct event (JEG). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by FreightWorks, LLC, John Albert Harris, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Gaudet, Nathan) Modified on 6/14/2022 to reflect correct event (JEG). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 8/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/6/2022. (KAH) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Attorney Gissel M. Ferriol regarding Oskar M. Perez who is Co-Counsel for party Julio Sosa Perez. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT Certificate Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b) of Filing State Court Record by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Record)(Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FreightWorks, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FreightWorks Holdings, LLC for FreightWorks, LLC.. (Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Interstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group, Corporate Parent National Interstate Corporation, Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. (AFG) for National Interstate Insurance Company.. (Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-716890. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2432695), filed by FreightWorks, LLC, John Albert Harris, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Citation to National Interstate Ins. Co., #3 Exhibit C - Long Arm Service to FreightWorks, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - "Other paper", #5 Exhibit E - Medical Bills, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Record, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Affidavit Verification)(Gaudet, Nathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Interstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan M Gaudet

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Guy D. Perrier