This case was last updated from PACER on 09/03/2021 at 06:58:04 (UTC).

Perez-Perez v. MMM Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Perez-Perez filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against MMM Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01349

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Luis Perez-Perez

Defendants

PMC Medicare Choice, Inc.

Triple-S Advantage, Inc.

John Doe

MCS Advantage, Inc.

MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.

MMM Holdings, Inc.

MMM Healthcare, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez

Attorney at Rodriguez Lopez Law Office

Po Box 7693

Ponce, PR 00732-7693

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to MCS Advantage, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc., Triple-S Advantage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

6 #5

Summons Summons to be Issued

6 #4

Summons Summons to be Issued

6 #3

Summons Summons to be Issued

6 #2

Summons Summons to be Issued

6 #1

Summons Summons to be Issued

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits six (6) Summons to be Issued re #1 Complaint filed by Luis Perez-Perez, 5 Order, (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be Issued, #2 Summons Summons to be Issued, #3 Summons Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons Summons to be Issued, #5 Summons Summons to be Issued) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Category Sheet Category Sheet

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Perez-Perez. Service due by 10/19/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 7/21/2020. (arg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6953262.), filed by Luis Perez-Perez. Service due by 10/15/2020,(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to MCS Advantage, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc., Triple-S Advantage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits six (6) Summons to be Issued re #1 Complaint filed by Luis Perez-Perez, 5 Order, (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be Issued, #2 Summons Summons to be Issued, #3 Summons Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons Summons to be Issued, #5 Summons Summons to be Issued) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Plaintiff filed the instant complaint on July 17, 2020 but has not provided the Court with proposed summonses. Plaintiff shall move the Court to issue summonses and provide proposed summonses within 15 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/9/2020.(wm) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Perez-Perez. Service due by 10/19/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 7/21/2020. (arg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6953262.), filed by Luis Perez-Perez. Service due by 10/15/2020,(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MMM Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Triple-S Advantage, Inc. is a litigant