This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 07:17:43 (UTC).

Perez Morales et al v. Gold Tim Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Perez Morales filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Gold Tim Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall, Roanne L. Mann and Taryn A. Merkl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01993

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judges

Roanne L. Mann

Taryn A. Merkl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Manuel Cruz Chimbay

Lucio Perez Morales

Defendants

Eun Im Huh

Sylvia Huh

Gold Tim Corp. doing business as Famous Gold Tim's Deli and Grill

Tommy Huh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Faillace

Attorney at Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 2540

New York, NY 10165

William Kevin Oates

Attorney at Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 4510

New York, NY 10165

Defendant Attorneys

Diana Y. Seo

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue. Suite 10G, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

Jian Hang

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on June 22, 2021 @ noon before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on June 18, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/28/2021. (LK) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

9 #1

Supplement Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer) (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jian Hang on behalf of Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh (aty to be noticed) (Hang, Jian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Y. Seo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucio Perez Morales, Manuel Cruz Chimbay. Gold Tim Corp. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William Kevin Oates on behalf of Manuel Cruz Chimbay, Lucio Perez Morales (aty to be noticed) (Oates, William) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

2 #2

Eun summons

2 #1

Tommy summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14371841 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Lucio Perez Morales, Manuel Cruz Chimbay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on June 22, 2021 @ noon before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on June 18, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/28/2021. (LK) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketORDER [9-1] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/28/2021. (LK) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer) (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jian Hang on behalf of Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh (aty to be noticed) (Hang, Jian) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Y. Seo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Seo, Diana) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucio Perez Morales, Manuel Cruz Chimbay. Gold Tim Corp. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William Kevin Oates on behalf of Manuel Cruz Chimbay, Lucio Perez Morales (aty to be noticed) (Oates, William) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Tommy summons, #2 Eun summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gold Tim Corp., Tommy Huh, Eun Im Huh filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14371841 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Lucio Perez Morales, Manuel Cruz Chimbay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Kevin Oates, JR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Antonio Faillace