This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:38:15 (UTC).

Perez Juarez v. Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Perez Juarez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. Reid Neureiter and Philip A. Brimmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01906

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

N. Reid Neureiter

Philip A. Brimmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monica Perez Juarez

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alissa M. Peashka

Attorney at Sawaya Law Firm

1600 North Ogden Street

Denver, CO 80218

Defendant Attorneys

Cheri R. Lazar

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co All parties do not consent.. (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alissa M. Peashka on behalf of Monica Perez JuarezAttorney Alissa M. Peashka added to party Monica Perez Juarez(pty:pla) (Peashka, Alissa) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 14 July 2021. Consent Form due by 9/16/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/23/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 06/23/2021. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co, filed by Monica Perez Juarez.(jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co Attorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co (pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co from ARAPAHOE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, Case Number 2021CV030802. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7958783), filed by Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01906-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co All parties do not consent.. (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alissa M. Peashka on behalf of Monica Perez JuarezAttorney Alissa M. Peashka added to party Monica Perez Juarez(pty:pla) (Peashka, Alissa) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #8 to Alissa M. Peashka Esq., #43645 c/o Sawaya, Rose, McClure & Wilhite P.C. 1600 N. Ogden StreetDenver, CO 80218. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 14 July 2021. Consent Form due by 9/16/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/23/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 06/23/2021. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co, filed by Monica Perez Juarez.(jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co Attorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co (pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co from ARAPAHOE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, Case Number 2021CV030802. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7958783), filed by Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheri R. Lazar