This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 07:44:46 (UTC).

Perez et al v. U.S. Attorney General et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Perez filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against U S Attorney General. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20109

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francisco William Perez

Angela Cortez

Defendants

U.S. Attorney General

District Director, USCIS Miami District Office

Secretary of Homeland Security

Linda Swacina

Respondent

Field Office Director, ICE Miami Field Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Andrew Prada

Attorney at Prada Urizar, PLLC

3191 Coral Way, Suite 500

Miami, FL 33145

Defendant Attorneys

Natalie Diaz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Miami, FL 33132

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#12

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #11 Amended Complaint, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Field Office Director, ICE Miami Field Office. (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT "as a matter of course" under FRCP 15(a)(1) against Secretary of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina, U.S. Attorney General, filed by Francisco William Perez, Angela Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Second Join Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Report. The parties shall filed their Joint Scheduling Report on or before March 13, 2020. Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/13/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to submit Joint Scheduling Report re 8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Angela Cortez, Francisco William Perez. Responses due by 3/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Report. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report on or before March 6, 2020. Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Secretary of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina, U.S. Attorney General. Responses due by 2/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diaz, Natalie) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of Secretary of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina, U.S. Attorney General. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Secretary of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Linda Swacina(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party U.S. Attorney General(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angela Cortez, Francisco William Perez re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Secretary of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cds) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against District Director, USCIS Miami District Office, Secretary of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12293324, filed by Francisco William Perez, Angela Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Notice of Similar Actions, #4 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.