This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 07:08:46 (UTC).

Perez et al v. South Shore Drywall Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Perez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against South Shore Drywall Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05215

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jorge Alberto Lopez Sanchez

Helder Perez

Defendants

Joseph Zangla

South Shore Drywall Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.K. Lee

Attorney at Lee Litigation Group, PLLC

148 West 24Th Street, Ste 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10011

Defendant Attorney

Christopher A. Smith

Attorney at Trivella, Forte & Smith, LLP

1311 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 170

White Plains, NY 10605

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Proposed Summons

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Joseph summons

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Zangla, South Shore Drywall Inc.. Joseph Zangla waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021; South Shore Drywall Inc. waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Smith on behalf of South Shore Drywall Inc., Joseph Zangla (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER IN FLSA CASE REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION SCHEDULE: The parties are ordered to engage in discovery as outlined in the attached Order, and to engage in early settlement discussions. A joint status report regarding settlement efforts must be filed by April 30, 2021. If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/30/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Joseph summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jorge Alberto Lopez Sanchez (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Helder Perez (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Helder Perez, Jorge Alberto Lopez Sanchez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Helder Perez, Jorge Alberto Lopez Sanchez (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against South Shore Drywall Inc., Joseph Zangla filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13603792 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Helder Perez, Jorge Alberto Lopez Sanchez. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Smith