This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 08:03:54 (UTC).

Perez et al v. Britax Child Safety Inc

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Perez filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Britax Child Safety Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01735

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathy Capron

Hadel Toma

Mark Wade

Karry Perez

Jessica Shropshall

John Fitzgerald

Defendant

Britax Child Safety Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harper Todd Segui

Attorney at Whitfield Bryson and Mason LLP

Po Box 1483

Mount Pleasant, SC 29465

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Steven Sachs

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kay Scholer LLP

250 W 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

John F Kuppens

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

Jay Thomas Thompson

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Lori Blake Leskin

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kay Scholer LLP

250 W 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Samuel W Outten

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (G)

Po Box 10084

Greenville, SC 29603-0084

Paige Hester Sharpe

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Britax Child Safety Inc.(Thompson, Jay) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Steven Sachs ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8582878) by Britax Child Safety Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kuppens, John) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lori Blake Leskin ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8582844) by Britax Child Safety Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kuppens, John) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Hester Sharpe on behalf of Britax Child Safety Inc (Sharpe, Paige) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Britax Child Safety Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thompson, Jay) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kathy Capron, John Fitzgerald, Karry Perez, Jessica Shropshall, Hadel Toma, Mark Wade.(asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Britax Child Safety Inc. (asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Britax Child Safety Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8510104.), filed by Jessica Shropshall, Karry Perez, Kathy Capron, John Fitzgerald, Hadel Toma, Mark Wade. Service due by 9/16/2019(asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Britax Child Safety Inc.(Thompson, Jay) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/29/2019.(asni, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/29/2019.(asni, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Steven Sachs ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8582878) by Britax Child Safety Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kuppens, John) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lori Blake Leskin ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8582844) by Britax Child Safety Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kuppens, John) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Hester Sharpe on behalf of Britax Child Safety Inc (Sharpe, Paige) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Britax Child Safety Inc answer due 8/19/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/18/2019.(mbro, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Britax Child Safety Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thompson, Jay) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kathy Capron, John Fitzgerald, Karry Perez, Jessica Shropshall, Hadel Toma, Mark Wade.(asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Britax Child Safety Inc. (asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Britax Child Safety Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8510104.), filed by Jessica Shropshall, Karry Perez, Kathy Capron, John Fitzgerald, Hadel Toma, Mark Wade. Service due by 9/16/2019(asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Britax Child Safety Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F Kuppens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori Blake Leskin