This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 06:05:58 (UTC).

Peredna v. Techalloy Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Peredna filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Techalloy Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip G. Reinhard and Margaret J. Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-50303

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

Referral Judge

Margaret J. Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Peredna

Defendants

Techalloy Company, Inc.

Central Wire, Inc.

Central Wire Industries, Ltd.

CWI Holding, Inc.

Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc.

USI Holding, Inc.

Arcelormittal International America, LLC

Arcelormittal USA Foundation, Inc.

Cleveland-Cliffs Steel, LLC

Gerry Roup

Henry Lopes

Richard Perlick

Richard Gustafson

Mike Grunthaner

David Plecner

Victor Polard

Carl Reed

Terry Taminausksas

Tom Hanewald

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephan David Blandin

Elise Marie Blandin

Friedl John Jason

Joseph Edward Kolar

Michael Raymond Grieco

Michael Elliot Holden

Defendant Attorneys

David Edward Kawala

David A. Kanter

Eric Jonathan Skwiat

Isabella Adriana Masini

Mark Joseph Mcloughlin

Stephen P Ellenbecker

Other Attorneys

Kingshuk K Roy

Kolton Allen Reed

Michael J McGowan

Craig Andrew Cappas

Jeffrey Irving Young

Daniel K. Cray

Maura Yusof

David F. Ryan

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#54

#53

#52

#51

#50

#49

#48

#47

18 #1

Exhibit A

#7

#6

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #53 , is denied as moot. The Court directs Defendant's attention to docket entry #47 , granting this relief to ALL Defendants. Mailed notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION by Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP for extension of time Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rachlis, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP by Michael Rachlis (Rachlis, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rangaire Manufacturing Company, LP by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Craig Andrew Cappas (Cappas, Craig) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Jeffrey Irving Young (Young, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Chemical Company by Michael J McGowan (McGowan, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant Henry Lopes' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until After Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #45 , is granted. The Court applies this ruling to ALL Defendants ALL Defendants are to respond to Plaintiff's complaint 21 days after resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Additionally, as to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 , ALL Defendants are directed to respond to the Motion to Remand 21 days after the last of the Defendants are served and appear. The Court draws the parties' attention to minute entry #46 , granting Plaintiff until 12/01/21 to effectuate service on the unserved defendants. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Her Deadline for Serving Process #42 , is granted. Plaintiff has until 12/01/21 to effectuate service on the remaining Defendants. Plaintiff is directed to submit a status report by 12/08/21 updating the Court on the status of service of the remaining Defendants. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION by Defendant Henry Lopes for extension of time to file answer to complaint (Skwiat, Eric) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Linda Peredna by Michael Raymond Grieco (Grieco, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Central Wire, Inc. by Eric Jonathan Skwiat (Skwiat, Eric) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Central Wire, Inc. by David Edward Kawala (Kawala, David) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Linda Peredna for leave to file Her Motion to Remand on or by August 24, 2021, and For Leave to File Her Motion in Excess of 15 Pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grieco, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMAILED Notice of Removal to Counsel for plaintiff. (jp, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 08/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants C P Chemicals, Inc. f/k/a Southern California Chemical Company, Inc., Phibro-Tech, Inc. by Kolton Allen Reed (Reed, Kolton) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants C P Chemicals, Inc. f/k/a Southern California Chemical Company, Inc., Phibro-Tech, Inc. by Kingshuk K Roy (Roy, Kingshuk) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roy, Kingshuk) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from McHenry County, case number (21 LA 000167) filed by C P Chemicals, Inc. f/k/a Southern California Chemical Company, Inc., Phibro-Tech, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18518337. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roy, Kingshuk) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less