This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2021 at 07:46:22 (UTC).

Perdue v. Halco, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Perdue filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Halco, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01889

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diamond N. Perdue

Defendants and Cross Defendants

John Does 1-3

Halco, Inc.

Progressive Specialty Insurance Company

Barry J. Hollis

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Defendant and Cross Claimant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared Matthew Lina

Attorney at Goldstein Hayes & Lina, LLC

One Buckhead Plaza, 3060 Peachtree Rd Nw, Ste 1000, Suite 1000

Atlanta, GA 30305

Jonathan P. Hayes

Attorney at Goldstein Hayes & Lina, LLC

3060 Peachtree Road Nw, Suite 1000

Atlanta, GA 30305

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Caroline Sims

Attorney at Copeland, Stair, Kingma & Lovell, LLP

191 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Melissa Lottie Bailey

Attorney at Copeland, Stair, Kingma & Lovell, LLP

191 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jack Allen Parker

Attorney at Waldon Adelman Castilla Hiestand & Prout

Suite 1040, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

Travis Jon Meyer

Attorney at Waldon Adelman Castilla Hiestand & Prout

900 Circle 75 Parkway, Suite 1040

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Jack Allen Parker

Attorney at Waldon Adelman Castilla Hiestand & Prout

Suite 1040, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

Travis Jon Meyer

Attorney at Waldon Adelman Castilla Hiestand & Prout

900 Circle 75 Parkway, Suite 1040

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Halco, Inc..(Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#25

(#25) Initial Disclosures by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #22 Certificate of Service, #23 Certificate of Service Rule 5.4 for Discovery Response by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #22 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANYS DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Responses of Barry J. Hollis to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests by Barry J. Hollis.(Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#20

(#20) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/11-14/21, 7/21-23 and 26/2021, 8/5-6 and 9/2021, 8/11-13/2021, 9/24-27/2021, 9/30, 10/1-4/2021, 10/5-8/2021, 12/1-3/2021, by Melissa Lottie Bailey. (Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim by Halco, Inc., Barry J. Hollis, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Bailey, Melissa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#7

(#19) ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim by Halco, Inc., Barry J. Hollis, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Bailey, Melissa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/09/2021)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit 12

1 #9

Exhibit 10

1 #7

Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 6

1 #4

Exhibit 5

1 #1

Exhibit 2

#1

(#7) State Farm Fire & Casualty Company ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand , First CROSSCLAIM against Halco, Inc., Barry J. Hollis, John Does 1-3, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Meyer, Travis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/12/2021)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Halco, Inc..(Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Initial Disclosures by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #22 Certificate of Service, #23 Certificate of Service Rule 5.4 for Discovery Response by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #22 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANYS DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Parker, Jack) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Responses of Barry J. Hollis to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests by Barry J. Hollis.(Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/11-14/21, 7/21-23 and 26/2021, 8/5-6 and 9/2021, 8/11-13/2021, 9/24-27/2021, 9/30, 10/1-4/2021, 10/5-8/2021, 12/1-3/2021, by Melissa Lottie Bailey. (Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim by Halco, Inc., Barry J. Hollis, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Bailey, Melissa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Initial Disclosures by Halco, Inc., Barry J. Hollis, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Initial Disclosures by Diamond N. Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hayes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hayes, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Certificate of Compliance (Meyer, Travis) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First Certificate of Interested Persons by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Meyer, Travis) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) State Farm Fire & Casualty Company ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand , First CROSSCLAIM against Halco, Inc., Barry J. Hollis, John Does 1-3, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Meyer, Travis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.3 by Halco, Inc..(Bailey, Melissa) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on May 7, 2021. (ash) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER re: #1 Notice of Removal originally filed in State court by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company on 05/05/2021. (jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/10/2021 (jkb). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Notice of removal originally filed in State court on 05/05/2021 by Barry J. Hollis.(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/13/2021 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER re: #1 Notice of removal originally filed in State court on 4/27/2021 by Halco, Inc (jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/10/2021 (jkb). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Halco, Inc., Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, John Does 1-3, Barry J. Hollis. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-10956681) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant