This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:48:43 (UTC).

Percy v. Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Percy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00891

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Percy

Defendant

Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Erich Sheer

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello

582 West Main St.

Norwich, CT 06360

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle Roseman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

265 Church St, Ste #300

New Haven, CT 06510

Lori B. Alexander

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.- NH, CT

One Century Tower, Suite 300, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC from Connecticut Superior Court, case number KNL-CV-22-6057243-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6997433, filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC.(Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Alexander on behalf of Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC Statement re Removed Case (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC Notice of No Pending Motions (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Roseman on behalf of Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC (Roseman, Kyle) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2022 Discovery due by 1/12/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/13/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/13/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/13/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Attachment

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 10, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Roseman, Kyle) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#14

(#14) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC.(Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by John Erich Sheer on behalf of Robert Percy (Sheer, John) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by John Erich Sheer on behalf of Robert Percy (Sheer, John) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docket(#15) ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Report is overdue. It shall be filed on or before September 19, 2022. Additionally, it has come to the Court's attention that counsel for the Plaintiff has failed to file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Rule 5(b). Attorney Sheer is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/7/2022.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC.(Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Defendant Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC to 8/10/2022. (Sweeney, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Defendant Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC to 8/10/2021. (Sweeney, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting on consent #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/20/2022. (Sweeney, Kevin) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 10, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Roseman, Kyle) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 7/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, #9 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC Signed by Clerk on 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/13/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/13/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2022 Discovery due by 1/12/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/13/2022. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketJudge Kari A. Dooley added. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Roseman on behalf of Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC (Roseman, Kyle) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC Notice of No Pending Motions (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC Statement re Removed Case (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Alexander on behalf of Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC from Connecticut Superior Court, case number KNL-CV-22-6057243-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6997433, filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC.(Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori B. Alexander