This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:46:13 (UTC).

Amber Perales v. Amazon.com Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On November 2, 2021, Amber Perales (“Plaintiff” or “Perales”), represented by Aanand Mehtani of Mehtani Law Offices, P.C., filed a civil rights lawsuit against Amazon.com Services LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief along with damages, pre-judgment interest, costs, and attorney’s fees, for allegedly taking adverse employment actions against the Plaintiff, including but not limited to refusing to provide the Plaintiff with reasonable accommodations and/or wrongfully terminating Plaintiff because of her actual and/or perceived disability. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Central District of California. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Around early February 2021, Plaintiff’s shoulder was in constant pain that prevented her from heavy lifting. All of Plaintiff’s managers – “Chris [Last Name Unknown],” “Danny [Last Name Unknown],” and two others – knew about Plaintiff’s condition. Chris told Plaintiff that she could restrict herself to light duty for the time being.” “A few days later, Plaintiff took two days off of work to tend to her shoulder. When Plaintiff returned to work, Plaintiff brought in a doctor’s certification indicating that she was excused for the two days off to tend to her disability.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “The next day, another employee from human resources (name unknown) told Plaintiff she was fired. Plaintiff was fired for taking too much time off. After her termination, she appealed the decision formally to human resources, and two days later, her termination was confirmed by human resources. As the Company’s records will reflect, Plaintiff complained specifically that she was being fired for missing days excused by her doctor to tend to her disability.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Indeed, substantial motivating factors for Plaintiff’s termination of employment were without limitation requests for disability accommodation, her taking of time off to tend to her disability, the Company’s animus towards Plaintiff because of her disability, and her complaints about violations of her rights under FEHA.” “In committing the foregoing acts, the Managing Agents willfully disregarded Plaintiff’s right to be free from unlawful discrimination and retaliation.” “In committing the foregoing acts, the Managing Agents acted despicably and subjected Plaintiff to cruel and unjust hardship in conscious disregard for Plaintiff’s rights under California law.” “In committing the foregoing acts, the Managing Agents intended to cause emotional and financial injury to Plaintiff.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out six claims for relief. The first claim is for alleged discrimination based upon disability in violation of FEHA. The second claim is for alleged failure to accommodate a disability in violation of FEHA. The third claim is for alleged failure to engage in the interactive process in violation of FEHA. The fourth claim is for alleged retaliation in violation of the FEHA. The fifth claim is for alleged failure to prevent discrimination and retaliation in violation of FEHA. The sixth claim is for alleged wrongful termination in violation of public policy.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for general damages, special damages and punitive damages in amounts according to proof and for injunctive and declaratory relief as provided by law. The Plaintiff further requested attorneys’ fees, statutory penalties, pre-judgment interest, costs of suit and such other and further relief as the Court deems fair and just. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01846

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amber Perales

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC,

Amazon.com Services, LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aanand Mehtani

Attorney at Mehtani Law Offices PC

2425 Olympic Blvd., Suite 4000W

Santa Monica, CA 90404

Defendant Attorneys

Emily Jeanne Fox

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Rita Leong

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Micheala Pizarro Delacruz

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32254556 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales. (Attorney Aanand Mehtani added to party Amber Perales(pty:pla))(Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales. (Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE & CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales, (Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales. (Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#10

(#10) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services, LLC answer now due 12/30/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC.(Attorney Micheala Pizarro Delacruz added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Delacruz, Micheala) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Jeanne Fox counsel for Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. Adding Emily J. Fox as counsel of record for Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Attorney Emily Jeanne Fox added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Fox, Emily) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rita Leong on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC (Attorney Rita Leong added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Leong, Rita) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC.(Leong, Rita) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC, identifying AMBER PERALES; AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC; Amazon.com, Inc.; Amazon.com Sales, Inc.. (Leong, Rita) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Leong, Rita) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Leong, Rita) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC, identifying AMBER PERALES; AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC; Amazon.com, Inc.; Amazon.com Sales, Inc.. (Leong, Rita) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC.(Leong, Rita) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rita Leong on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC (Attorney Rita Leong added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Leong, Rita) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Jeanne Fox counsel for Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. Adding Emily J. Fox as counsel of record for Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Attorney Emily Jeanne Fox added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Fox, Emily) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services, LLC answer now due 12/30/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC.(Attorney Micheala Pizarro Delacruz added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Delacruz, Micheala) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales. (Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE & CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales, (Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales. (Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32254556 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Amber Perales. (Attorney Aanand Mehtani added to party Amber Perales(pty:pla))(Mehtani, Aanand) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rita Leong