This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:40:46 (UTC).

Pepperdine v. Perry et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Pepperdine filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Perry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04073

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Pepperdine

Defendants

Dale Leon Perry

Roane Transportation Services, LLC

Cherokee Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James A. Rice, Jr.

Attorney at Office of James A. Rice, Jr.

563 Spring Street

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Carl Maddaleni

Attorney at Cruser, Mitchell LLP

275 Scientific Drive, Suite 2000

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Jason Guy Wyrick

Attorney at Cruser, Mitchell, Novitz, Sanchez, Gaston & Zimet, LLP

Meridian Ii, Suite 2000, 275 Scientific Drive

Norcross, GA 30092

Joseph Robb Cruser

Attorney at Cruser, Mitchell, Novitz, Sanchez, Gaston & Zimet, LLP

Meridian Ii, Suite 2000, 275 Scientific Drive

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#16

(#16) Certificate of Interested Persons by Jason Pepperdine. (Rice, James) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#15

(#15) Initial Disclosures by Jason Pepperdine.(Rice, James) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jason Pepperdine.(Rice, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 5/2/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/04/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Order. Defendants have not been properly served. Defendants have acknowledged service, however, effective the date of this Order. As such, Defendants shall have thirty (30) days to file an amended responsive pleading and shall have forty-five (45) days to respond to Plaintiff's written discovery. Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal is hereby withdrawn. It is further concluded that jurisdiction and venue are proper in this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/03/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#11

(#11) Reply to #6 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC re #6 Response (Non-Motion) (Wyrick, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2021 to edit text (jkb). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Consent MOTION for Order by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#9

(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#8

(#8) Initial Disclosures by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Jason Pepperdine. Dale Leon Perry served on 10/12/2021. (Rice, James) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

6 #2

Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Service (Cherokee)

6 #1

Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service (Roane)

#6

(#6) (Withdrawn per Order #12 )RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal,, in Opposition filed by Jason Pepperdine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service (Roane), #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Service (Cherokee))(Rice, James) Modified on 11/4/2021 to edit text(jkb). (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#5

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate of Interested Persons by Jason Pepperdine. (Rice, James) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial Disclosures by Jason Pepperdine.(Rice, James) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jason Pepperdine.(Rice, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 5/2/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/04/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Order. Defendants have not been properly served. Defendants have acknowledged service, however, effective the date of this Order. As such, Defendants shall have thirty (30) days to file an amended responsive pleading and shall have forty-five (45) days to respond to Plaintiff's written discovery. Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal is hereby withdrawn. It is further concluded that jurisdiction and venue are proper in this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/03/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Reply to #6 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC re #6 Response (Non-Motion) (Wyrick, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2021 to edit text (jkb). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION for Order by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Disclosures by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Jason Pepperdine. Dale Leon Perry served on 10/12/2021. (Rice, James) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (Withdrawn per Order #12 )RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal,, in Opposition filed by Jason Pepperdine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service (Roane), #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Service (Cherokee))(Rice, James) Modified on 11/4/2021 to edit text(jkb). (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSTANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 5, 2021. (ash) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Oakland Financial Corporation for Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (vs) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cherokee Insurance Company.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dale Leon Perry. Discovery ends on 2/28/2022.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11298780) filed by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 Request for Admissions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cherokee Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Guy Wyrick