This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2020 at 08:07:17 (UTC).

People's Capital and Leasing Corp. v. Schaefer, Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 People's Capital and Leasing Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Schaefer, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14058

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People's Capital and Leasing Corp.

Defendants

Louis E. Schaefer, Jr.

Sea Tech Industries, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Armistead Mason Long

Attorney at Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett, McCollam (Lafayette)

400 East Kaliste Saloom Rd., Suite 4200

Lafayette, LA 70508-8517

Micah Collins Zeno

Attorney at Gordon, Arata, Montgomery & Barnett (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170-4000

Adam B Marks

Attorney at Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.

100 Pearl Street, 17Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06123

Evan S Goldstein

Attorney at Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.

100 Pearl Street, 17Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Matthew Stiles

Attorney at Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.

100 Pearl Street, P.O. Box 231277

Hartford, CT 06123-1227

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louis E. Schaefer, Jr served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Long, Armistead) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER denying #17 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Clerk (clc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Affidavit

#17

(#17) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Louis E. Schafer, Jr. and Sea Tech Industries, L.L.C. by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Long, Armistead) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

16 #1

Pro Hac Vice Notice

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Stiles. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Evan S Goldstein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

10 #4

Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing

10 #3

Exhibit Affidavit

10 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew K. Stiles (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8024845) by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing)(Long, Armistead) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

8 #4

Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing

8 #3

Exhibit Affidavit

8 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Evan S. Goldstein (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8023974) by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing)(Long, Armistead) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louis E. Schaefer, Jr served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Long, Armistead) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER denying #17 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Clerk (clc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Louis E. Schafer, Jr. and Sea Tech Industries, L.L.C. by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Long, Armistead) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Stiles. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Evan S Goldstein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam B Marks. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/3/2020. (mm) (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (mm). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louis E. Schaefer, Jr served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Long, Armistead) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney selected the incorrect party that was served. Clerk took corrective action to reset answer deadlines - Sea Tech Industries, LLC served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. No further action necessary. (sa) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sea Tech Industries, LLC served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Long, Armistead) Modified text/service info on 12/30/2019 (sa). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew K. Stiles (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8024845) by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing)(Long, Armistead) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam B. Marks (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8024779) by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Consent of Electronic Filing)(Long, Armistead) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Evan S. Goldstein (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8023974) by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing)(Long, Armistead) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney did not enter People's United Bank, N.A.as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.** Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Louis E. Schaefer, Jr., Sea Tech Industries, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by People's Capital and Leasing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent People's United Bank, N.A. for People's Capital and Leasing Corp. (Long, Armistead) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8007788) filed by People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)Attorney Armistead Mason Long added to party People's Capital and Leasing Corp.(pty:pla).(Long, Armistead) (Attachment 8 replaced on 12/5/2019) (am). (Attachment 9 replaced on 12/5/2019) (am). Modified text on 12/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People's Capital and Leasing Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Stiles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Armistead Mason Long

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Micah Collins Zeno