This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2021 at 04:29:31 (UTC).

People.ai, Inc. v. Clari Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 People ai, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Clari Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Donato and William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-06314

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James Donato

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

People.ai, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Clari Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lucas I. Silva

Adam Wyatt Poff

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor

The Brandywine Building, 1000 West Street, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899-0391

Lucas Isaac Silva

Attorney at Foley and Lardner

111 Huntington Ave

Boston, MA 02199

Matthew W Peters

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

777 E Wisconsin Ave

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5300

Robert M. Vrana

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Thomas A James

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

321 N. Clark St., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Alan Ouellette

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

555 California Street, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94102

Jeffrey N. Costakos

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 E. Wisconsin Avenue, 33Rd Floor

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian P Egan

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison - NY

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York City, NY 10019-6064

Cameron Paul Clark

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Daralyn J. Durie

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew Treloar Jones

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

953 East Third Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Eugene Novikov

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raghav R. Krishnapriyan

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#69

(#69) STIPULATION To Modify Certain Patent Local Rule Deadlines filed by People.ai, Inc.. (Silva, Lucas) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

68 #3

Proposed Order

68 #2

Exhibit A

68 #1

Declaration of Eugene Novikov

68 #68

Main Document

#67

RESTRICTED

#66

(#66) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. JOINT PROPOSED REVISIONS DUE 11/26/2021 AT NOON. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

53 #3

Exhibit A

#53

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) STIPULATION To Modify Certain Patent Local Rule Deadlines filed by People.ai, Inc.. (Silva, Lucas) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) MOTION to Amend/Correct #66 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Clari Inc.. Responses due by 12/10/2021. Replies due by 12/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Novikov, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Novikov, Eugene) (Filed on 11/26/2021) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/18/21, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2022. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. JOINT PROPOSED REVISIONS DUE 11/26/2021 AT NOON. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 11/18/2021 before Judge William Alsup regarding the motion for judgment on the pleadings #53 . Hearing held and oral argument heard. The Court takes the motion under submission. Total Time in Court: 51 mins. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Lucas Silva and Jeff Costakos. Defendant Attorney: Daralyn Durie. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2021) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by People.ai, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Lucas I. Silva, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order)(Silva, Lucas) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by People.ai, Inc.. (Silva, Lucas) (Filed on 11/10/2021) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#62) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 18, 2021 AT 8:00 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 11/18/2021 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2021) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) REPLY (re #53 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byClari Inc.. (Novikov, Eugene) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Clari, Inc. (Novikov, Eugene) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Clari Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to April 19, 2021 filed by Clari Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/6/21. (ntl) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to April 19, 2021 - filed by Clari Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People.ai, Inc.. Clari Inc. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by People.ai, Inc. (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 10,657,129 B2; US 10,872,106 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Clari Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3570955.) - filed by People.ai, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People.ai, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raghav R. Krishnapriyan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eugene Novikov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P. Egan