This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2021 at 10:24:07 (UTC).

People.ai, Inc. v. Clari Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 People ai, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Clari Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People.ai, Inc.

Defendant

Clari Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Wyatt Poff

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert M. Vrana

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jeffrey N. Costakos

Lucas I. Silva

Defendant Attorney

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#22

21 #8

Exhibit H through N

21 #7

Exhibit G

21 #6

Exhibit F

21 #5

Exhibit E

21 #4

Exhibit D

21 #2

Exhibit B

21 #1

Exhibit A

#21

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,565,229 ;10,496,634 ;10,657,132 ;10,503,783 ;10,922,345 . (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clari Inc.- filed by People.ai, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H through N)(Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DECLARATION re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404//DECLARATION of Lucas I. Silva by People.ai, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through F)(Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by People.ai, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/17/2021. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for People.ai to file its Answering Briefs in Opposition to Clari's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 8) and Clari's Motion to Transfer Venue (D.I. 11) to May 10, 2021, and to extend the time for Clari to file its Reply Briefs to May 20, 2021 filed by People.ai, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/3/21. (ntl) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for People.ai to file its Answering Briefs in Opposition to Clari's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 8) and Clari's Motion to Transfer Venue (D.I. 11) to May 10, 2021, and to extend the time for Clari to file its Reply Briefs to May 20, 2021 - filed by People.ai, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey N. Costakos,Lucas I. Silva for People.ai, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Eugene Novikov and Andrew T. Jones filed by Clari Inc., #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey N. Costakos, Esquire and Lucas I. Silva, Esquire filed by People.ai, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/21. (ntl) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey N. Costakos, Esquire and Lucas I. Silva, Esquire - filed by People.ai, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Eugene Novikov and Andrew T. Jones - filed by Clari Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Clari Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to April 19, 2021 filed by Clari Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/6/21. (ntl) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to April 19, 2021 - filed by Clari Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People.ai, Inc.. Clari Inc. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by People.ai, Inc. (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 10,657,129 B2; US 10,872,106 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Clari Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3570955.) - filed by People.ai, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People.ai, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY N. COSTAKOS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucas I. Silva

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Vrana