Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:35:18 (UTC).

People Source Staffing Professionals L L C v. Robertson et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 People Source Staffing Professionals L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Robertson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00430

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

People Source Staffing Professionals, LLC

People Source Staffing Professionals L L C

Defendants

Shauna Bailey

Anna Robertson

Wayne Williamson

Will Source, Inc.

Kathy Williamson

Will Source Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Glenn Morris

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al (BR)

450 Laurel St 20Th Fl

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Christopher Michael Vitenas

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al (BR)

450 Laurel St 20Th Fl

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Defendant Attorneys

April Martin Hammett

Attorney at McNew King et al

2400 Forsythe Ave Ste 2

Monroe, LA 71201

Brady D King, II

Attorney at McNew King et al

2400 Forsythe Ave Ste 2

Monroe, LA 71201

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Intent to dismiss Shauna Bailey for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

24 #11

Exhibit 10

24 #10

Exhibit 9

24 #9

Exhibit 8

24 #7

Exhibit 6

24 #6

Exhibit 5

24 #5

Exhibit 4

24 #4

Exhibit 3

24 #1

Verification

1 #13

Proposed summons/writ

1 #12

Proposed summons/writ

1 #11

Exhibit 10

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE of Intent to dismiss Shauna Bailey for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Strike #24 Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Hearing filed by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. (aty,Vitenas, Christopher) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #31 MOTION to Strike #24 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for Hearing. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Corrective Action to Brady D King, II on behalf of Anna Robertson, Will Source Inc, Kathy Williamson, Wayne Williamson regarding #30 MOTION to Strike and Partial Motion to Dismiss and Request for Hearing Prior to Trial Pursuant to Rule 12(i), #31 MOTION to Strike #24 Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Hearing. Action taken: Terminated #30 Motion to Strike. #31 Motion resubmitted in its entirety. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION to Strike, Motion for Partial Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for Hearing by Anna Robertson, Will Source Inc, Kathy Williamson, Wayne Williamson. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,King, Brady). Added MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for Hearing and modified docket text on 6/17/2019 (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) FILED IN ERROR. MOTION to Strike and Partial Motion to Dismiss and Request for Hearing Prior to Trial Pursuant to Rule 12(i) by Anna Robertson, Will Source Inc, Kathy Williamson, Wayne Williamson. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (aty,King, Brady) Modified on 6/17/2019 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion day set for 7/24/2019 at 9:00 AM in Monroe, 2nd floor before Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER granting #27 Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing. The hearing is re-set to July 24, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.. Exhibit and Witness Lists due by 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/30/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • (#28) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/30/2019. (jud,Hayes, Karen) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Transferred regarding #27 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Putch, A) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Expedite consideration of #8 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Injunction Order)(aty,Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. Shauna Bailey served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (aty,Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. Will Source Inc served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (aty,Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. Wayne Williamson served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (aty,Morris, Christopher) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. Anna Robertson served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (aty,Morris, Christopher) Modified on 4/16/2019 to correct service and answer due dates (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Christopher Glenn Morris on behalf of People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/22/2019. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shauna Bailey, Anna Robertson, Will Source Inc, Kathy Williamson, Wayne Williamson (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Request for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against Shauna Bailey, Anna Robertson, Will Source Inc, Kathy Williamson, Wayne Williamson with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3918641) filed by People Source Staffing Professionals L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed summons/writ, #13 Proposed summons/writ, #14 Proposed summons/writ, #15 Proposed summons/writ, #16 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Christopher Glenn Morris added to party People Source Staffing Professionals, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Morris, Christopher) Modified on 4/8/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People Source Staffing Professionals L L C is a litigant