This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2021 at 08:19:26 (UTC).

People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York v. The GEO Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York filed an Other lawsuit against The GEO Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11084

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York

Defendant

The GEO Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsay McKenzie

Attorney at NYS Office of The Attorney General

28 Liberty St., 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Lillian Marie Marquez

Attorney at NYS Office of The Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W. Kirk

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Kevin A. Fritz

Attorney at Meister Seelig & Fein LLP

125 Park Avenue, 7Th Fl.

New York, NY 10017

Tiernan Kane

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Steven Lindsay

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

1 #11

Exhibit K - Affirm. of L. Marquez with Exhibits

1 #10

Exhibit J - Mem. of Law in Support of Verified Petition

1 #8

Exhibit H - June 15 Second GEO Subpoena Duces Tecum

1 #7

Exhibit G - June 15 Amended GEO Subpoena Ad Testificandum

1 #6

Exhibit F - June 15 OAG Cover Letter to Second GEO Subpoena Duces Tecum

1 #5

Exhibit E - June 2 Letter from GEO Counsel to OAG

1 #4

Exhibit D - May Subpoena Duces Tecum and OAG Letter

1 #3

Exhibit C - May Subpoena Ad Testificandum and OAG Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A - Verified Petition

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: The following briefing schedule will apply to the New York Attorney General's petition to enforce the subpoenas and The Geo Group, Inc.'s ("GEO") motion to dismiss: GEO's opposition to the petition and its motion to dismiss is due on March 2,2021; the Attorney General's reply and its opposition to GEO's motion to dismiss isdue on March 16, 2021; GEO's reply, if any, is due by March 23, 2021. So Ordered. (Responses due by 3/2/2021, Replies due by 3/23/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/15/2021) (js) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Lindsay McKenzie dated January 25, 2021 re: The GEO Group's Pre-Motion Conference Letter. Document filed by People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(McKenzie, Lindsay) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay McKenzie on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(McKenzie, Lindsay) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael W. Kirk dated January 20, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by The GEO Group, Inc...(Kirk, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lillian Marie Marquez on behalf of People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York..(Marquez, Lillian) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 MOTION for Tiernan Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/11/2021) (jca) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 MOTION for Steven J. Lindsay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/11/2021) (jca) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin A. Fritz on behalf of The GEO Group, Inc...(Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Tiernan Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23422660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Steven J. Lindsay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23422152. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Tiernan Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23422660. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The GEO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tiernan Kane, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing IN, #3 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kane, Tiernan) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Steven J. Lindsay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23422152. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The GEO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven J. Lindsay, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing VA, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Lindsay, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, that: 1. GEO's deadline for responding to the New York Attorney General's verified petition shall be January 20, 2021. 2. Nothing in this stipulation shall be interpreted to waive the New York Attorney General's right to move to remand the action to state court under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Stipulation may be signed in counterparts, and a facsimile or copy of this document shall have the same force and effect as an original. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 1/20/2021), Motions terminated: #4 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants the People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York and The GEO Group, Inc. addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from filed by The GEO Group, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/5/2021) (jca) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants the People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York and The GEO Group, Inc. addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael W. Kirk and Lillian M. Marquez dated 01/04/2021. Document filed by The GEO Group, Inc...(Kirk, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The GEO Group, Inc...(Kirk, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirk, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York County. Case Number: 452565/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23276114).Document filed by The GEO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Petition, #3 Exhibit C - May Subpoena Ad Testificandum and OAG Letter, #4 Exhibit D - May Subpoena Duces Tecum and OAG Letter, #5 Exhibit E - June 2 Letter from GEO Counsel to OAG, #6 Exhibit F - June 15 OAG Cover Letter to Second GEO Subpoena Duces Tecum, #7 Exhibit G - June 15 Amended GEO Subpoena Ad Testificandum, #8 Exhibit H - June 15 Second GEO Subpoena Duces Tecum, #9 Exhibit I - June 23 Letter from GEO Counsel to OAG, #10 Exhibit J - Mem. of Law in Support of Verified Petition, #11 Exhibit K - Affirm. of L. Marquez with Exhibits).(Kirk, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEO GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin A. Fritz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven John Lindsay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Kirk