This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 11:08:11 (UTC).

People of the State of Illinois et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 People of the State of Illinois filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45286

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

County of Union

People of the State of Illinois

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Insys Therapeutics Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cephalon Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

H.D. Smith LLC

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J. Lech

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli

2227 South State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Sherry A. Knutson

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Margaret Catherine O'Connor

Attorney at Dechert

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Erik W. Snapp

Attorney at Dechert - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Nicholas Martin Berg

Attorney at Ropes & Gray

32Nd Floor, 191 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Kyle Alexander Cooper

Attorney at Tabet DiVito & Rothstein

The Rookery Building, 7Th Floor, 209 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Daniel L. Stanner

Attorney at Tabet DiVito Rothstein

7Th Floor, South Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Tinos Diamantatos

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

7700 Forsyth Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63105

Sarah E. Harmon

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

7700 Forsyth Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63105

Kenneth M. Gorenberg

Attorney at Wildman, Harrold, Allen, Dixon

225 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Other Attorneys

Timothy W. Knapp

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Daniel I. Schlessinger

Attorney at Lord, Bissell & Brook

115 South Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Martin L. Roth

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Steven T. Whitmer

Attorney at Locke Lord - Chicago

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Conor B. O'Croinin

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder

100 E Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Donna M. Welch

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Emily Newhouse Dillingham

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

70 West Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Andrea Verney

Attorney at Locke Lord

111 S. Wcker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Sky Anne Emison

Attorney at Locke Lord

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#47

46 #1

*Restricted*

#46

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#34

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Farrell, Jr filed by on behalf of County of Union, People of Union County, People of the State of Illinois. (Farrell, Paul) (Main Document 47 replaced on 5/7/2019) (P,R). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern. Case number 1:19-cv-02169. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) TRANSFERRED to the Northern District Ohio the electronic record. (nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 04/17/2019. (nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint #34 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/8/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Specgx LLC (Berg, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mallinckrodt LLC (Berg, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC by Nicholas Martin Berg (Berg, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Diamantatos, Tinos) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs County of Union, The People of Union County, The People of the State of Illinois by Thomas Lech (Lech, Thomas) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15656028. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record.(rp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by CVS Health Corporation of Filing Notice of Filing Removal in State Court (Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Steven Todd Whitmer (Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Andrea Verney (Verney, Andrea) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Verney, Andrea) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-003909) filed by CVS Health Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15648026. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Emison, Sky) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H.D. Smith, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant