This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:28:02 (UTC).

Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers et al v. Breneman, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Breneman, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James E. Murray

Dan Reding

Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers

Defendants

James Breneman, LLC

Site Worx, Inc.

Breneman, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Koji Iwasaki

Attorney at Saltzman & Johnson Law Corporation

1141 Harbor Parkway, Suite 100

Alameda, CA 94502

Anne M. Bevington

Attorney at Saltzman & Johnson Law Corporation

1141 Harbor Bay Parkway, Suite 100

Alameda, CA 94502

Allan Darren Shuldiner

Attorney at Saltzman & Johnson Law Corporation

1141 Harbor Bay Parkway, Suite 100

Alameda, CA 94502

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James E. Murray, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Dan Reding.. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, James E. Murray, Dan Reding. Breneman, Inc. served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; James Breneman, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020; Site Worx, Inc. served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Breneman, Inc., James Breneman, LLC, Site Worx, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Breneman, Inc., James Breneman, LLC, Site Worx, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14041679.). Filed byPension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, James E. Murray, Dan Reding. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Entry of Default filed by James E. Murray, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Dan Reding. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 3/2/2020) Modified on 3/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by James E. Murray, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Dan Reding (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Entry of Default filed by James E. Murray, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Dan Reding. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 3/2/2020) Modified on 3/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, James E. Murray, Dan Reding. Breneman, Inc. served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; James Breneman, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020; Site Worx, Inc. served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Breneman, Inc., James Breneman, LLC, Site Worx, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James E. Murray, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Dan Reding.. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by James E. Murray, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Dan Reding (Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Breneman, Inc., James Breneman, LLC, Site Worx, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14041679.). Filed byPension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, James E. Murray, Dan Reding. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iwasaki, Eric) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less