This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2022 at 06:26:05 (UTC).

Pennino et al v. Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Pennino filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael North and Ivan L.R. Lemelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00363

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael North

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Goulds Pumps IPG, LLC

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Flowserve US Inc

Hobart Brothers Company

Honeywell International Inc.

CertainTeed Corporation

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Crane Company

Joy Global Underground Mining LLC

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Joy Industries, Inc.

Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.

Zurich American Insurance Company as successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company

Cummins, Inc.

Navistar, Inc.

111 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Sarah Elizabeth McMillan

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC (New Orleans)

601 Poydras St., 12Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer E. Adams

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1555 Poydras St., Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bradley Adam Hays

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg

365 Canal Street, Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

David R. Frohn

Attorney at MG&M Law Firm

3729 Cobblestone Drive

Lake Charles, LA 70605-2570

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Helen Meredith Buckley

Attorney at Christian & Small LLP

505 North 20Th Street, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher O. Massenburg

Attorney at Manning Gross and Massenburg LLP

One Canal Place, 365 Canal Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Forrest Ren Wilkes

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

Deborah DeRoche Kuchler

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

105 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#325

(#325) ORDER GRANTING #324 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs' claims against Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co., are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/20/2022. (dw) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

324 #1

Proposed Order

#324

(#324) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co. With Prejudice by Phyllis Pennino and Sally Pennino, and Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romero, Jacqueline) Modified text on 10/20/2022 (pp). (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#323

(#323) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the action be and is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/12/2022.(jls) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

319 #319

Main Document

110 #6

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

110 #5

Exhibit

110 #3

Exhibit

110 #1

Memorandum in Support

7 #1

Summons

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

690 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#325) ORDER GRANTING #324 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs' claims against Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co., are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/20/2022. (dw) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#324) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co. With Prejudice by Phyllis Pennino and Sally Pennino, and Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romero, Jacqueline) Modified text on 10/20/2022 (pp). (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#323) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the action be and is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/12/2022.(jls) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#322) ORDER GRANTING #319 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Sally Pennino's claims against Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.'s #110 motion for summary judgment is hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/11/2022. (pp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#321) ORDER GRANTING #318 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Sally Penninos claims against DCo, LLC in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that DCo, LLC's #166 motion for summary judgment and motion to exclude the opinions of Brent C. Staggs, M.D. and Thomas P. Rudolph (Rec. Docs. 252, 305) are hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/11/2022. (pp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#320) ORDER GRANTING #314 Motion to Withdraw re #306 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Brent Staggs, MD and Thomas Rudolph, CIH. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/11/2022. (pp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#319) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. by Plaintiff, Sally Pennino, and Defendant, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCormick, John) Modified text on 8/11/2022 (pp). (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#318) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party DCo by Plaintiff, Sally Pennino, and Defendant, DCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Amber) Modified text on 8/11/2022 (pp). (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) ORDER GRANTING #312 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Sally Pennino's claims against Imo Industries, Inc. in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/10/2022. (pp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#316) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Sally Pennino's claims against Hyster-Yale Group, Inc. in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hyster-Yale Group, Inc.'s #253 motion for summary judgment and #304 motion to exclude the opinions of Brent C. Staggs, M.D. and Thomas P. Rudolph are hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/10/2022.(pp) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
305 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Union Carbide's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Hutington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claims by Union Carbide Corporation.Attorney Milele N. St. Julien added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:crd).(St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Joy Technologies, Inc. (pp) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request of Summons Issued as to Joy Industries, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Stewart, Whitney) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Eagle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bm) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request of Summons Issued as to Eagle, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Stewart, Whitney) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request of Summons Issued as to Armstrong Pumps, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Stewart, Whitney) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/23/2021.(jeg) (NEF: Sections B and D) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Albert J. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company. (lt) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, case number 2018-9798, Div. F (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8742143) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert J. Bossier, Jr, OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert J. Bossier, Jr(pty:3pp), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:crc), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/22/2021) (jeg). Modified text/filer on 2/22/2021 (lt). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOBART BROTHERS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC. is a litigant