This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 08:12:52 (UTC).

Pennington et al v. Taylor et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Pennington filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen Michael Doyle and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00695

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oliver Nicholes

Randy Pennington

Herbert Stevens

Defendants

Charles Ward

John Q. Hamm

Steve Marshall

Hal Taylor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa Shawn Graybill

Attorney at SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER

201 St Charles Ave - Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70170

Riya Saha Shah

Attorney at Juvenile Law Center

The Philadelphia Building, 1315 Walnut Street; Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Marsha Levick

Attorney at Juvenile Law Center

The Philadelphia Building, 1315 Walnut Street; Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Ebony Glenn Howard

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

400 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36104

Jonathan Michael Barry-Blocker

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

400 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36104

Marsha L Levick

Attorney at Juvenile Law Center

1315 Walnut St - 4Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Lynnette Kim Miner

Attorney at SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER

400 Washington Ave

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

Brad A. Chynoweth

Attorney at State of Alabama

501 Washington Avenue, Post Office Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Brenton Merrill Smith

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Alabama

501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

23 #2

fee receipt

23 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#23) Motion for Riya Saha Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602055693.) by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenton Merrill Smith on behalf of John Q. Hamm, Steve Marshall, Hal Taylor, Charles Ward (Smith, Brenton) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

13 #6

Exhibit Nicholes Sex Offender Registration

13 #5

Exhibit Nicholes Court Records

13 #4

Exhibit Stevens Alabama SJIS Case Detail

13 #1

Exhibit Pennington Court Records

6 #1

certificate of good standing

#5

(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Barry-Blocker, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy Pennington, Oliver Nicholes, Herbert Stevens. All Defendants. (Barry-Blocker, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to John Q. Hamm, Steve Marshall, Hal Taylor, Charles Ward and returned to counsel with copies of complaint for personal service by process server on defendants. (djy, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

2 #1

standing order & format

#2

(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Barry-Blocker, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

1 #2

fee receipt

1 #1

civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against John Q. Hamm, Steve Marshall, Hal Taylor, Charles Ward ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054975.), filed by Randy Pennington, Oliver Nicholes, Herbert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Motion for Riya Saha Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602055693.) by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenton Merrill Smith on behalf of John Q. Hamm, Steve Marshall, Hal Taylor, Charles Ward (Smith, Brenton) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER GRANTING #20 MOTION for Extension of Time; the #13 Motion to dismiss is reset for Submission, without oral argument, on 1/13/2020, with any opposition brief by 12/16/2019, and any reply to the opposition due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/1/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Order,, Set Deadlines, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barry-Blocker, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER directing that the #13 MOTION TO DISMISS is set for submission, without oral argument, on 11/21/2019, with any opposition brief due by 11/14/2019, and any reply to the opposition due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/24/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steve Marshall. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Q. Hamm. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hal Taylor. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles Ward. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Q. Hamm, Steve Marshall, Hal Taylor, Charles Ward. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Lisa Graybill Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/8/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Marsha L. Levick Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for the plfs. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/8/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Correction re #7 Motion for Lisa Graybill to Appear Pro Hac Vice to correct the erroneous Exhibit A previously attached to the docket entry (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A certificate of good standing to docket entry #7 )(djy, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion for Lisa Graybill to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602055167.) by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-certificate of good standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/8/2019) (djy, ). (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Marsha L. Levick to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602055166.) by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Oliver Nicholes, Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Barry-Blocker, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy Pennington, Oliver Nicholes, Herbert Stevens. All Defendants. (Barry-Blocker, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to John Q. Hamm, Steve Marshall, Hal Taylor, Charles Ward and returned to counsel with copies of complaint for personal service by process server on defendants. (djy, ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Randy Pennington, Herbert Stevens, & Oliver Nicholes; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against John Q. Hamm, Steve Marshall, Hal Taylor, Charles Ward ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054975.), filed by Randy Pennington, Oliver Nicholes, Herbert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.