Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 09:15:39 (UTC).

Penn v. State of Vermont

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Penn filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Vermont. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judges overseeing this case are John M. Conroy and Geoffrey W. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John M. Conroy

Presiding Judge

Geoffrey W. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory H. Penn

Tutwiler, MS 39863

Defendant

State of Vermont

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David E. Tartter

Attorney at Office of the Vermont Attorney General

109 State Street

Montpelier, VT 05609-1001

 

Court Documents

7 #9

Exhibit I

7 #8

Exhibit H

7 #7

Exhibit G

7 #6

Exhibit F

7 #5

Exhibit E

7 #4

Exhibit D

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Images same as #5 .) (hbc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

5 #9

Exhibit I

5 #8

Exhibit H

5 #7

Exhibit G

5 #6

Exhibit F

5 #5

Exhibit E

5 #4

Exhibit D

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Tartter, David) Attachment descriptions corrected on 6/17/2020. (hbc) (Images same as #7 .) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Images same as #5 .) (hbc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Vermont re #5 Answer to Complaint, #7 Motion to Dismiss.(Tartter, David) Link added on 6/17/2020 (law). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Tartter, David) Attachment descriptions corrected on 6/17/2020. (hbc) (Images same as #7 .) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gregory H. Penn. (eh) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Respondent shall within 60 days file an answer to #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as required by Rule 5, 28 U.S.C. 2254 and Petitioner shall have 30 days thereafter to reply. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 4/30/2020. (eh) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Gregory H. Penn. (eh) Date filed clarified on 4/28/2020 (law). (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Gregory H. Penn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory H. Penn, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) Date filed clarified on 4/28/2020 (law). (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less