This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2022 at 09:29:38 (UTC).

Penn-Star Insurance Company v. Yi-Sun Chiu et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Penn-Star Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Yi-Sun Chiu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Penn-Star Insurance Company

Defendants

Yi-Sun Chiu

Christy Zheng Lei

Mr. Chiu Construction LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edmund K. Saffery

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Wayne R. Wagner

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel

999 Bishop Street, Suite 1600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Wen Sheng Gao

Attorney at Law Office of Wen Sheng Gao

810 Richards Street, #639

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, Mr. Chiu Construction LLC.(Gao, Wen Sheng) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#15

(#15) FIRST STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/9/2022. APPROVED AND SO ORDERED: The Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from October 12, 2022 to October 24, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. Scheduling Conference Statements and Report of Planning Meeting shall be filed by October 17, 2022. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. ( Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 08:30AM on 10/24/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER.) (eta) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#14

(#14) FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/30/2022. Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, and Mr. Chiu Construction LLC answer due 9/28/2022.(jo) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Wen Sheng Gao on behalf of Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, Mr. Chiu Construction LLC on behalf of Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, Mr. Chiu Construction LLC. (Gao, Wen Sheng) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Yi-Sun Chiu served on 8/17/2022. (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Mr. Chiu Construction LLC served on 8/17/2022. (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Summons Returned Executed. Christy Z. Lei served on 8/17/2022. Acknowledgement filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wagner, Wayne) Modified on 8/24/2022 (jo) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

9 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

9 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Mr. Chiu Construction LLC. (eta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei. (eta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons (Proposed) (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, Mr. Chiu Construction LLC.(Gao, Wen Sheng) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FIRST STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/9/2022. APPROVED AND SO ORDERED: The Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from October 12, 2022 to October 24, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. Scheduling Conference Statements and Report of Planning Meeting shall be filed by October 17, 2022. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. ( Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 08:30AM on 10/24/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER.) (eta) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/30/2022. Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, and Mr. Chiu Construction LLC answer due 9/28/2022.(jo) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Wen Sheng Gao on behalf of Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, Mr. Chiu Construction LLC on behalf of Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, Mr. Chiu Construction LLC. (Gao, Wen Sheng) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Yi-Sun Chiu served on 8/17/2022. (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Mr. Chiu Construction LLC served on 8/17/2022. (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Summons Returned Executed. Christy Z. Lei served on 8/17/2022. Acknowledgement filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wagner, Wayne) Modified on 8/24/2022 (jo) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/12/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Mr. Chiu Construction LLC. (eta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei. (eta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00375 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons (Proposed) (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons (Proposed) (Wagner, Wayne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Yi-Sun Chiu, Christy Zheng Lei, Mr. Chiu Construction LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2722318.), filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Wayne) Modified on 8/15/2022 (eta). (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penn-Star Insurance Company is a litigant