This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2020 at 10:03:59 (UTC).

Penhall v. Young Living Essential Oils

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Penhall filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Young Living Essential Oils. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dee Benson and Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00617

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dee Benson

Referral Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lindsay Penhall

Defendant

Young Living Essential Oils, LC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicole A. Skolout

Attorney at TOMCHAK LAW PC

10 W 100 S Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Trisha K. Monesi

Attorney at CAPSTONE LAW APC

1875 Century Park E Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven R. Weinmann

Attorney at CAPSTONE LAW APC

1875 Century Park E Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher D. Moon

Attorney at MOON LAW APC

600 W Broadway Ste 700

San Diego, CA 92101

Tarek H. Zohdy

Attorney at CAPSTONE LAW APC

1875 Century Park E Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Cody R. Padgett

Attorney at CAPSTONE LAW APC

1875 Century Park E Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin O. Moon

Attorney at MOON LAW APC

600 W Broadway Ste 700 24Th Flr

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan S. Johansen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Thomas M. Melsheimer

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Jeffrey J. Hunt

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

John C.C. Sanders, Jr

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert S. Clark

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

J. Travis Underwood

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pear St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Olivia Adendorff

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1601 Elm St

Dallas, TX 75201

Rachael A. Rezabek

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1601 Elm St

Dallas, TX 75201

David C. Reymann

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jeremy A. Fielding

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1601 Elm St

Dallas, TX 75201

Katrina G. Eash

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

James Grant Jones

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

609 Main St

Houston, TX 77002

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

73 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for an Extension of Time for P

68 #18

Exhibit 18

68 #17

Exhibit 17

68 #14

Exhibit 14

68 #13

Exhibit 13

68 #12

Exhibit 12

68 #11

Exhibit 11

68 #2

Exhibit 2

#68

5 #2

Proposed Order

#5

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to First Amended Class Action Complaint

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ORDER granting #73 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Response re #68 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff Lindsay Penhall shall have until November 11, 2020 to file her Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration (ECF 68). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/26/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER granting #72 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachael A. Rezabek for Young Living Essential Oils, LC.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/23/20. (jwt) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ORDER granting #71 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Grant Jones for Young Living Essential Oils, LC.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/23/20. (jwt) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeremy A. Fielding for Young Living Essential Oils, LC.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/23/20. (jwt) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ORDER granting #69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Olivia Adendorff for Young Living Essential Oils, LC.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/23/2020. (jwt) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Lindsay Penhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for an Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Skolout, Nicole) Modified on 10/27/2020 by changing event type(lnp). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Rezabek , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3766575,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Grant Jones , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3766562,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Fielding , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3766549,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Olivia Adendorff , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3766531,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johansen, Bryan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3) or Transfer Under 1404(a) by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn Obi, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Obi, Shawn) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Obi, Shawn) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Young Living Essential Oils, LC of case(s) 1:19-cv-412 (USDC - WDTX - Austin Division). (Obi, Shawn) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindsay Penhall re #4 Amended Complaint (Moon, Christopher) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Granting #5 Joint Motion To Extend Time To Respond To First Amended Complaint. Young Living Essential Oils, LC response due 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/6/2020(mme) [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn R. Obi, #2 Proposed Order)(Obi, Shawn)Attorney Shawn Rieko Obi added to party Young Living Essential Oils, LC(pty:dft) Modified on 1/2/2020. Q.C. Mailer re: Proposed Orders need to be sent to the email associated with the assigned Judge (sjm). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Young Living Essential Oils, LC, filed by Lindsay Penhall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to First Amended Class Action Complaint) (Moon, Christopher) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lindsay Penhall. Young Living Essential Oils, LC served. (Moon, Christopher) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Young Living Essential Oils, LC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13244279.), filed by Lindsay Penhall. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02340-JLS-RBB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Moon, Christopher)(jmo) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 9/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUNG LIVING ESSENTIAL OILS, L.C,, doing business as Young Living Essential Oils is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin O Moon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven R Weinmann