This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2022 at 13:23:16 (UTC).

SI v. BED BATH & BEYOND CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On August 23, 2022, Pengcheng Si ("Plaintiff"), individually and on behalf of all other persons similarly situated, represented by Pengcheng Si of DWS Law Group, PLLC, filed a class action civil lawsuit against Bed Bath & Beyond Corporation ("BBBY" or the "Company"), J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (“JPM”), RC Ventures LLC (“RC”), Ryan Cohen (“Cohen”), and Arnal Gustavo (“Gustavo”) (collectively, "Defendants"), alleging making misleading statements and omissions to investors regarding: BBBY's strategic company plans and financial condition; cooperation with Cohen and RC; and reports of shares holding and selling during the class period. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with Judge Trevor N. McFadden presiding.

Plaintiff filed this federal securities class action on behalf of a class consisting of all persons or entities, other than Defendants, who purchased or otherwise acquired BBBY common stock from March 25, 2022 to August 18, 2022, inclusive, (the "Class Period").

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “from March 2022 through August 2022, Cohen, in conspiracy with Gustavo, JPM, and others, engaged in a fraudulent scheme to artificially inflate the price of BBBY publicly traded stock. More specifically, Cohen, Gustavo, and others, with JPM’s aiding and abetting, blatantly misrepresented the value and profitability of BBBY, inter alia, causing BBBY to (a) report revenues that was fictitious, and (b) announce publicly that the Company is successfully on the way spinning off Buybuy Baby to ‘unlock[] full value’ of this ‘tremendous asset’, when, in reality, the Buybuy Baby business were small, with minimal revenues, and outside companies would pay BBBY only a small fraction of the announced prices.”

Plaintiff further alleged that “on August 18, 2022, BBBY filed Form 8K announcing that ‘[on August 17, 2022, in response to certain media inquiries, Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (the ‘Company’) made the following statement: ‘We were pleased to have reached a constructive agreement with RC Ventures in March and are committed to maximizing value for all shareholders.’ Still, BBBY made no mention of the buying frenzy pumping up the price of BBBY stock and then the share-dumping crash created by Cohen, Gustavo, and JPM’s collusion.”

Plaintiff also alleged that “BBBY’s conduct with respect to August 18, 2022 announcement constitutes acts of fraud, dishonesty and furtherance of Cohen and Gustavo’s criminal activities. Gustavo, Cohen, and JPM discussed when to exit their trade positions and therefore the August 17, 2022 statement was materially false and constitute a false statement. Defendants had concealed material facts and misled investors when they liquidated the Company's stocks.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged that “BBBY intentionally provided the materially false statement knowing that it would have a material impact on the market value of BBBY.”

Plaintiff presented seven claims for relief alleging breach of fiduciary duty, aiding and abetting breach of fiduciary duty, fraud, aiding and abetting fraud, negligent misrepresentation, and violations of Sections 10(b) and 20(a) of the Exchange Act and Rule 10b-5. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested certification as a class action, damages, and fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02541

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Trevor N. McFadden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENGCHENG SI

Defendants

RC VENTURES LLC

RYAN COHEN

ARNAL GUSTAVO

BED BATH & BEYOND CORPORATION

JP MORGAN SECURITIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jan Messerschmidt

Steven J. Toll

 

Court Documents

14 #10

Exhibit CMST Resume

14 #9

Exhibit BGG Resume

14 #8

Exhibit Pomerantz Resume

14 #7

Exhibit Bratya Declaration

14 #4

Exhibit Damages Calculation

14 #3

Declaration Lieberman Declaration

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

14 #1

Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support

14 #14

Main Document

#5

RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Messerschmidt on behalf of PENGCHENG SI (Messerschmidt, Jan).Your attorney renewal certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 9/16/2022. (zbaj) Modified on 9/9/2022 (zbaj). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Toll on behalf of PENGCHENG SI (Toll, Steven) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/26/22. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2022

DocketMINUTE ORDER: Allen Gallegly and Bratya SPRL must file any opposition to the other partys Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by November 14, 2022. Any opposition must address, in detail, which party has "the largest financial interest" in the litigation. 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(iii)((bb). And any Reply must be filed by November 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/9/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by BRATYA SPRL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Lieberman Declaration, #4 Exhibit Damages Calculation, #5 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #6 Exhibit Bratya Certification, #7 Exhibit Bratya Declaration, #8 Exhibit Pomerantz Resume, #9 Exhibit BGG Resume, #10 Exhibit CMST Resume)(Messerschmidt, Jan) Modified filer on 11/8/2022 (zed). (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) DECLARATION of Frederic S. Fox by Allen Gallegly re #12 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Allen Gallegly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -September 8, 2022 Notice of Pendency of this Class Action on Accesswire, #2 Exhibit B - Galleglys sworn Certification pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, #3 Exhibit C - Chart calculating the losses incurred by Gallegly prepared by counsel, #4 Exhibit D - Firm resume of Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP)(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel by Allen Gallegly. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BED BATH & BEYOND CORPORATION, RYAN COHEN, JP MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, RC VENTURES LLC. (zed) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PENGCHENG SI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Messerschmidt, Jan) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service due by 12/21/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Amended Complaint is Granted for good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Plaintiff must serve Defendants by December 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/3/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Amended Complaint on Defendants by PENGCHENG SI. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Messerschmidt, Jan) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by PENGCHENG SI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Copy)(Messerschmidt, Jan) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
View All Docket Entries
09/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Messerschmidt on behalf of PENGCHENG SI (Messerschmidt, Jan).Your attorney renewal certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 9/16/2022. (zbaj) Modified on 9/9/2022 (zbaj). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Messerschmidt on behalf of PENGCHENG SI (Messerschmidt, Jan) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Toll on behalf of PENGCHENG SI (Toll, Steven) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/26/22. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketSUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants (znmg) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ERRATA COMPLAINT by PENGCHENG SI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Si, Pengcheng) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/26/2022) (znmg). (Entered: 08/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to ssi@dwslawgroup.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet; emailed to ssi@dwslawgroup.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. Civil Cover Sheet, section IV: 2 nature of suits were selected. Please choose one and refile., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9463010) filed by SI PENGCHENG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Si, Pengcheng) Modified on 8/24/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 08/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less