This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2019 at 07:36:04 (UTC).

Pendleton v. Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Pendleton filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02762

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hope Pendleton

Defendant

Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A. Voytas, Jr.

Attorney at ROSS AND VOYTAS, LLC

12444 Powerscourt Dr., Suite 370

St. Louis, MO 63131

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory R. Neidle

Attorney at DOBBS AND NEIDLE, P.C.

30150 Telegraph Road, Suite 410

Bingham Farms, MI 48025

Daniel J Ammon

Attorney at DOBBS AND NEIDLE, P.C.

30150 Telegraph Road, Suite 410

Bingham Farms, MI 48025

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J Ammon. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7591127) by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ammon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#13

(#13) SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Supplemental Response) filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ammon, Daniel) Modified on 11/26/2019 (MCB). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Hope Pendleton. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Motion to Join Parties due by 1/13/2020. Discovery Completion due by 5/25/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. ADR Future Reference 4/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S - St. Louis before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Pretrial Compliance due by 10/20/2020. Motion in Limine due by 10/26/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/26/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#5) Letter to attorney Gregory R. Neidle from Clerk re: Admission To Practice Law (MFG) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#9

(#9) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Hope Pendleton. . (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc..(Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending the conclusion of Plaintiff's bankruptcy case or the abandonment of her claim by the bankruptcy trustee, whichever occurs first. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 10 days following any event in the bankruptcy case affecting the present case, the parties shall advise the Court of such event and request further relief from this Court as appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the interim, this case shall be deemed closed for statistical purposes. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/26/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc... (Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#7

(#7) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/18/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/25/2019 03:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 21, 2019. (MCB) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#4

(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Hope Pendleton.(MFG) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-AC11885, with receipt number AMOEDC-7516296, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complete State Court File and Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Exhibit A Complete State Court File and Docket

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Ammon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending the conclusion of Plaintiff's bankruptcy case or the abandonment of her claim by the bankruptcy trustee, whichever occurs first. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 10 days following any event in the bankruptcy case affecting the present case, the parties shall advise the Court of such event and request further relief from this Court as appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the interim, this case shall be deemed closed for statistical purposes. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/26/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Motion to Join Parties due by 1/13/2020. Discovery Completion due by 5/25/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. ADR Future Reference 4/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S - St. Louis before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Pretrial Compliance due by 10/20/2020. Motion in Limine due by 10/26/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/26/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Supplemental Response) filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ammon, Daniel) Modified on 11/26/2019 (MCB). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Docket Text ORDER Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J Ammon by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/20/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Ammon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J Ammon. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7591127) by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ammon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Hope Pendleton. . (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Hope Pendleton. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/18/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/25/2019 03:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 21, 2019. (MCB) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc..(Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter to attorney Gregory R. Neidle from Clerk re: Admission To Practice Law (MFG) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Hope Pendleton.(MFG) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc... (Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-AC11885, with receipt number AMOEDC-7516296, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complete State Court File and Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Neidle, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.