Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2020 at 09:03:00 (UTC).

Pendergraff v. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 Pendergraff filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00366

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tanja Pendergraf

Tanja Pendergraff

Defendant

Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA (Cincinnati)

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Tanja Pendergraff (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by Plaintiff Tanja Pendergraff. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (bjc) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

3 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on May 11, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. (eh) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7456778), filed by Tanja Pendergraf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated per #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (sct) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Tanja Pendergraff (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Case Pending Arbitration. The parties shall submit status reports by email to chambers at cole_chambers@oshd.uscourts.gov every 180 days during the pendency of the stay. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 6/4/20. (sct) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by Plaintiff Tanja Pendergraff. (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc.. Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (bjc) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on May 11, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. (eh) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Family Dollar Stores of Ohio, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7456778), filed by Tanja Pendergraf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Keith Hymore