This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 10:58:40 (UTC).

PENALVA et al v. ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC., et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 PENALVA filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ROYAL ALUMINUM CO , INC . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10225

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN DOES 1-50

ALEX PENALVA

Defendants and Cross Claimants

CLAREMONT COMPANY

ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,

FICTITIOUSLY NAMED JACK AND JANE DOES 1-10

JOHN INELLI

ABC CORP 1-10

CLAREMONT COMPANY doing business as NFF CONSTRUCTION GROUP

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,

JOHN INELLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMISON MICHAEL MARK

Attorney at Deutsch Atkins, PC

25 Main Street, Suite 104

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

JOSEPH M. BOYAN

Attorney at HEDINGER & LAWLESS LLC

147 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

JUSTIN SCHWAM

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

49 Market Street

Morristown, NJ 07960

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

JUSTIN SCHWAM

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

49 Market Street

Morristown, NJ 07960

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN INELLI, ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC., by CLAREMONT COMPANY.(BOYAN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,. (SCHWAM, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN INELLI, ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,.(SCHWAM, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEX PENALVA. JOHN INELLI waiver sent on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC., waiver sent on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (MARK, JAMISON) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEX PENALVA. CLAREMONT COMPANY waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (MARK, JAMISON) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CLAREMONT COMPANY, JOHN INELLI, ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (Ti) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9591970) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALEX PENALVA.(MARK, JAMISON) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN INELLI, ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC., by CLAREMONT COMPANY.(BOYAN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,. (SCHWAM, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN INELLI, ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,.(SCHWAM, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEX PENALVA. JOHN INELLI waiver sent on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC., waiver sent on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (MARK, JAMISON) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEX PENALVA. CLAREMONT COMPANY waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (MARK, JAMISON) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CLAREMONT COMPANY, JOHN INELLI, ROYAL ALUMINUM CO., INC.,. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (Ti) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9591970) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALEX PENALVA.(MARK, JAMISON) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CLAREMONT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMISON MICHAEL MARK