This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:42:12 (UTC).

PENA v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 PENA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy L. Waldor and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES PENA

Defendants

WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.

WHOLE FOODS MARKET

WHOLE FOODS MARKET WORLD HEADQUARTERS

WHOLE FOODS MARKET MID-ATLANTIC REGIONAL OFFICE

JOHN DOES 1-100

ABC CORPORATION 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEAN-CLAUDE G. LABADY

Attorney at BLITZ & BLITZ, LLC

8901 Kennedy Blvd., Suite 5W

North Bergen, NJ 07047

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE

Attorney at FISHMAN MCINTYRE BERKELEY LEVINE SAMANSKY P.C.

120 Eagle Rock Avenue

East Hanover, NJ 07936-3158

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WHOLE FOODS MARKET, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET MID-ATLANTIC REGIONAL OFFICE, WHOLE FOODS MARKET WORLD HEADQUARTERS. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WHOLE FOODS MARKET, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET MID-ATLANTIC REGIONAL OFFICE, WHOLE FOODS MARKET WORLD HEADQUARTERS.(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/8/2022. (sm) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/8/2022. (sm) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/8/2022. (sm) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/8/2022. (sm) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/8/2022. (tjg, ) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct the initial telephone conference already scheduled for 3/8/22 via its dedicated conference line. The parties are instructed to dial 1-888-808-6929 and enter Access Code 9464201 at the time of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/7/2022. (tjd) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 3/8/22 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/31/22. (tjg, ) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WHOLE FOODS MARKET, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET MID-ATLANTIC REGIONAL OFFICE, WHOLE FOODS MARKET WORLD HEADQUARTERS.(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WHOLE FOODS MARKET, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET MID-ATLANTIC REGIONAL OFFICE, WHOLE FOODS MARKET WORLD HEADQUARTERS. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WHOLE FOODS MARKET WORLD HEADQUARTERS, WHOLE FOODS MARKET MID-ATLANTIC REGIONAL OFFICE, WHOLE FOODS MARKET, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. from BERGEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number BER-L-7055-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13116236), filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET WORLD HEADQUARTERS, WHOLE FOODS MARKET MID-ATLANTIC REGIONAL OFFICE, WHOLE FOODS MARKET, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE