This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:05:15 (UTC).

Pena v. The Long Island Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Pena filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against The Long Island Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Denis R. Hurley and A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06872

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denis R. Hurley

Referral Judge

A. Kathleen Tomlinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Pena

Defendant

The Long Island Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip Patrick Vogt

Attorney at Law Office of Philip P. Vogt, PLLC

5 Penn Plaza, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10001

Philip John Vogt

Attorney at The Law Office of Philip P. Vogt, PLLC

5 Penn Plaza, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10001

Defendant Attorney

Christopher J Pogan

Attorney at Salenger Sack Kimmel & Bavaro LLP

180 Froehlich Farm Blvd

Woodbury, NY 11797

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: DEADLINES AND COURT APPEARANCES. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/28/2020. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#11

(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Initial Conference held on 1/27/2020. The Discovery Status Conference will be held on June 19, 2020 at 11 a.m. The Case Management and Scheduling Order will be entered separately. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip John Vogt on behalf of Joseph Pena (aty to be noticed) (Vogt, Philip) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#9

(#9) Proposed Scheduling Order by Joseph Pena (Chiatto, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#8

(#8) LIRR Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (Pogan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA - NYC Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company and MTA Staten Island Railway for The Long Island Railroad Company. (Pogan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Pogan on behalf of The Long Island Railroad Company (aty to be noticed) (Pogan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Pena. The Long Island Railroad Company served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Chiatto, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#4

(#4) INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for January 27, 2020 at 11 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/16/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12132477 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joseph Pena. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vogt, Philip) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: DEADLINES AND COURT APPEARANCES. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/28/2020. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Initial Conference held on 1/27/2020. The Discovery Status Conference will be held on June 19, 2020 at 11 a.m. The Case Management and Scheduling Order will be entered separately. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip John Vogt on behalf of Joseph Pena (aty to be noticed) (Vogt, Philip) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Scheduling Order by Joseph Pena (Chiatto, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LIRR Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (Pogan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA - NYC Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company and MTA Staten Island Railway for The Long Island Railroad Company. (Pogan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Pogan on behalf of The Long Island Railroad Company (aty to be noticed) (Pogan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Pena. The Long Island Railroad Company served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Chiatto, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for January 27, 2020 at 11 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/16/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketThis attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12132477 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joseph Pena. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vogt, Philip) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less