This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2021 at 08:37:20 (UTC).

Pena v. CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Pena filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leda D. Wettre and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00767

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Madison Pena

Defendants

CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.

Chipotle Mexican Grill of Westfield, NJ

XYZ CORP. 1-10

JOHN DOE FOOD SERVER 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID L. WIKSTROM

Defendant Attorneys

JUSTIN T. NASTRO

WILLIAM H. YOST, III

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/6/2021 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2021. fact Discovery due by 7/9/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 6/9/2021.;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/9/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#9

(#9) Joint Discovery Plan by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC..(NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. WIKSTROM on behalf of MADISON PENA (WIKSTROM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#7

(#7) LETTER ORDER - A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3/9/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/22/2021. (kd) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC..(NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#5

(#5) Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (ld, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit Response to Demand for Damages

1 #1

Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Affidavit of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Union County, case number UNN-L-4035-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11979289), filed by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Response to Demand for Damages)(NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/6/2021 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2021. fact Discovery due by 7/9/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 6/9/2021.;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/9/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Scheduling Conference held on 3/9/2021. (kd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Discovery Plan by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC..(NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. WIKSTROM on behalf of MADISON PENA (WIKSTROM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER ORDER - A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3/9/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/22/2021. (kd) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC..(NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (ld, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Union County, case number UNN-L-4035-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11979289), filed by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Response to Demand for Damages)(NASTRO, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less