This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:15:46 (UTC).

Pena-Nevarro v. Nguyen et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Pena-Nevarro filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nguyen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A. Jackson and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marina Pena-Nevarro

Defendants

Julie Nguyen

AAA Insurance Company doing business as Auto Club Group Insurance

MemberSelect Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amira A. Makke

Attorney at Fini Law Firm

405 St. Ferdinand Street, 70802

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Kellen James Mathews

Attorney at Adams and Reese

450 Laurel St., Suite 1900

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Taylor Michelle LeDuff

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP

450 Laurel Street, Suite 1900

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

 

Court Documents

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal

11 #1

Consent Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal

#11

(#11) MOTION to Substitute Consent Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal and Memorandum in Support by MemberSelect Insurance Company, Julie Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Consent Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal, #2 Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Order)(LeDuff, Taylor) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

10 #3

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

10 #2

Attachment Deposition - Pena-Navarro

10 #1

Attachment Declaration - Julie Nguyen

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by MemberSelect Insurance Company, Julie Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration - Julie Nguyen, #2 Attachment Deposition - Pena-Navarro, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(LeDuff, Taylor) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

9 #4

Memorandum in Support

9 #3

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

9 #2

Attachment Proposed Amended Notice of Removal

9 #1

Attachment Attachment 1 - Deposition Pena-Navarro

#9

(#9) CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal by MemberSelect Insurance Company, Julie Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1 - Deposition Pena-Navarro, #2 Attachment Proposed Amended Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(LeDuff, Taylor) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/20/2022) (EDC). Modified on 4/20/2022 to edit text and rotate pages. (EDC). (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/22/2022) (LLH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2022: #4 Memorandum in Support) (LLH). Modified on 4/22/2022 to substitute pleadings as per Order #12 (LLH). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

5 #1

*Restricted*

4 #3

Exhibit Deposition of Julie Nguyen

4 #2

Proposed Pleading;

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Julie Nguyen)(Makke, Amira) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Substitute Pleading. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 9 with R. Doc. 11-1 and 11-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Substitute Consent Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal and Memorandum in Support . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Substitute Consent Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal and Memorandum in Support by MemberSelect Insurance Company, Julie Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Consent Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal, #2 Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Order)(LeDuff, Taylor) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by MemberSelect Insurance Company, Julie Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration - Julie Nguyen, #2 Attachment Deposition - Pena-Navarro, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(LeDuff, Taylor) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Amend and Substitute Notice of Removal by MemberSelect Insurance Company, Julie Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1 - Deposition Pena-Navarro, #2 Attachment Proposed Amended Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(LeDuff, Taylor) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/20/2022) (EDC). Modified on 4/20/2022 to edit text and rotate pages. (EDC). (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/22/2022) (LLH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2022: #4 Memorandum in Support) (LLH). Modified on 4/22/2022 to substitute pleadings as per Order #12 (LLH). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #5 Motion and Order for Leave of Court to Supplement and Amend Petition (Motion), filed by Plaintiff Marina Pena-Nevarro, without prejudice to reurging. Although the Motion seeks leave to amend the Complaint to change the allegations as to the citizenship of Defendant Julie Nguyen (R. Doc. 5-1), none of the circumstances under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) permitting amendment as a matter of course are applicable, nor is there any indication whether defendants consent to the amendment. Any reurged motion must (1) comply with Local Civil Rule 7(e) by including a certificate evidencing Plaintiffs attempt to obtain consent from all parties having an interest to oppose the Motion and stating the position of the other parties, and (2) attach a proposed comprehensive pleading that includes all of Plaintiffs numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, and which will become the operative complaint in this matter without reference to any other document in the record if leave is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/05/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #4 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2022 is CANCELED. No status report is due. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION and Order for Leave of Court to Supplement and Amend Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MemberSelect Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto Club Insurance Corporation for MemberSelect Insurance Company.. (LeDuff, Taylor) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion and Order for Leave of Court to Supplement and Amend Petition against All Plaintiffs, filed by Marina Pena-Nevarro. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Leave of Court)(Makke, Amira) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/30/2022) (EDC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2022: #2 Attachment) (EDC). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/30/2022) (EDC). Modified on 3/30/2022 to correct orientation and to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Julie Nguyen)(Makke, Amira) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2022 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/8/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Attorney Amira A. Makke regarding Johanna R. H. Fini who is Co-Counsel for Plaintiff Marina Pena-Nevarro. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LLH) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baton Rouge City Court, Case Number 21-01211. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2400734), filed by MemberSelect Insurance Company, AAA Insurance Company, Julie Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing, #3 Attachment Civil Case cover)(Mathews, Kellen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEMBERSELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kellen James Mathews