This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2023 at 06:15:35 (UTC).

Pelton et al v. John Crane, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Pelton filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against John Crane, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04316

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chloyde Pelton

Shirley Pelton

Counter Defendants and Defendants

Crown, Cork and Seal Company, Inc., successor-in-interest to Mundet Cork Company

John Crane, Inc.

Carrier Global Corporation

Crane Co.

Flowserve US, Inc., solely as successor in interest to Edward Valves, Inc.

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump Business

Gardner Denver, Inc.

General Electric Company

Alfa Laval Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Purifiers

Amtrol Inc., successor-in-interest to Thrush Company and H.A. Thrush Company

Carrier Corporaion

Caterpillar, Inc.

Cleaver-Brooks, a Division of Aqua-CHem, Inc.

Grinnell, LLC d/b/a Grinnell Corporation

Cross Defendants, Counter Claimants and Defendants

John Crane, Inc.

Gardner Denver, Inc.

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Defendant

Crane Co.

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence King Holcomb

Ethan Flint

Cross Defendant, Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Mark I. Tivin

Pamela Rose Gamble

Charles Matthew Alva

Other Attorneys

Edward J. McCambridge

Jason Patrick Eckerly

Daniel William McGrath

Meggie Francine Hogan

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#260

(#260) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephone status hearing held on 8/29/2023. Jury trial set for 12/4/2023 at 9:30 a.m. for 10 trial days (through 12/15/2023). Pretrial schedule set as follows: Pretrial order, motions in limine, and jury instructions are due by 10/20/2023. Responses to the motions in limine are due by 11/3/2023. Pretrial conference set for 11/17/2023 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Dial toll-free call-in number: 888-684-8852; followed by the conference access code: 9482028#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions deemed necessary by the court. The parties are directed to submit their pretrial filings in compliance with Judge Tharp's pretrial standing order for civil jury trials, which is available at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/tharp/Jury.pdf. In addition, absent prior leave of court, motions in limine (not including exhibits) are limited to a total of 15 pages per side (not per motion), and responses (not including exhibits) are likewise limited to a total of 15 pages per side. Jury instructions should be ordered in one complete set that incorporates plaintiff's and defendant's proposed instructions in a single collated sequential order (as opposed to plaintiff's proposed instructions followed by defendant's proposed instructions). And, for proposed jury instructions that are disputed, the grounds for the objection (and any proposed modification or alternate instruction) must be concisely stated on the same page immediately following the disputed instruction. The party proposing the instruction may then state concisely the reasons supporting the instruction as proposed. In addition to filing the proposed jury instructions on the docket, the parties should also send a Word version of the proposed instructions to the court's proposed order inbox. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#259

(#259) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Status hearing held on 8/22/2023 via Webex. Telephone status hearing set for 8/29/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Dial toll-free call-in number: (888) 684-8852; followed by the conference access code: 9482028#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

#258

(#258) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The status hearing set for 8/22/2023 is reset to begin at 9:15 a.m. (Time change only). (rao, ) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

#257

(#257) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Status hearing set for 8/22/2023 at 8:30 a.m. via Webex. The court will provide the parties with the link to join prior to the hearing. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

256 #3

Exhibit C

256 #2

Exhibit B

256 #1

Exhibit A

#256

(#256) SUPPLEMENT to status report #254 by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Danhelka, Anthony) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

254 #4

Exhibit D

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

386 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#260) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephone status hearing held on 8/29/2023. Jury trial set for 12/4/2023 at 9:30 a.m. for 10 trial days (through 12/15/2023). Pretrial schedule set as follows: Pretrial order, motions in limine, and jury instructions are due by 10/20/2023. Responses to the motions in limine are due by 11/3/2023. Pretrial conference set for 11/17/2023 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Dial toll-free call-in number: 888-684-8852; followed by the conference access code: 9482028#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions deemed necessary by the court. The parties are directed to submit their pretrial filings in compliance with Judge Tharp's pretrial standing order for civil jury trials, which is available at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/tharp/Jury.pdf. In addition, absent prior leave of court, motions in limine (not including exhibits) are limited to a total of 15 pages per side (not per motion), and responses (not including exhibits) are likewise limited to a total of 15 pages per side. Jury instructions should be ordered in one complete set that incorporates plaintiff's and defendant's proposed instructions in a single collated sequential order (as opposed to plaintiff's proposed instructions followed by defendant's proposed instructions). And, for proposed jury instructions that are disputed, the grounds for the objection (and any proposed modification or alternate instruction) must be concisely stated on the same page immediately following the disputed instruction. The party proposing the instruction may then state concisely the reasons supporting the instruction as proposed. In addition to filing the proposed jury instructions on the docket, the parties should also send a Word version of the proposed instructions to the court's proposed order inbox. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#259) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Status hearing held on 8/22/2023 via Webex. Telephone status hearing set for 8/29/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Dial toll-free call-in number: (888) 684-8852; followed by the conference access code: 9482028#. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#258) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The status hearing set for 8/22/2023 is reset to begin at 9:15 a.m. (Time change only). (rao, ) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Status hearing set for 8/22/2023 at 8:30 a.m. via Webex. The court will provide the parties with the link to join prior to the hearing. (rao, ) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) SUPPLEMENT to status report #254 by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Danhelka, Anthony) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a third amended complaint #253 is granted. Plaintiff has already filed this document on the docket. #252 . (rao, ) (Entered: 08/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) STATUS Report (Joint) by John Crane, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Danhelka, Anthony) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) MOTION by Plaintiffs Chloyde Pelton, Shirley Pelton for leave to file Third Amended Complaint (Holcomb, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) Third AMENDED complaint by Chloyde Pelton, Shirley Pelton against All Defendants and terminating IMO Industries Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc., and C.H. Wheeler Manufacturing Company (Holcomb, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephone status hearing held on 7/26/2023. The parties report that the only defendant proceeding to trial will be John Crane, Inc. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 8/2/2023 regarding the potential trial dates that were discussed. (rao, ) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosure by John Crane, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Master Witness Disclosure, #2 Exhibit Attachment B - Master Exhibit List)(Danhelka, Anthony) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc. (Danhelka, Anthony) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gamble, Pamela) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane, Inc. by Anthony David Danhelka (Danhelka, Anthony) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (exr, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane, Inc. by Mark I. Tivin (Tivin, Mark) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane, Inc. by Pamela Rose Gamble (Gamble, Pamela) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gamble, Pamela) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2021L006906) filed by John Crane, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18561616. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gamble, Pamela) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less