This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 08:31:15 (UTC).

Peloso Benitez v. Moniz

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Peloso Benitez filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Moniz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas P. Woodlock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11407

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas P. Woodlock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cesar Peloso Benitez

Respondent

Antone Moniz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oriosto Medrano Santana

One Boston Place

Boston, MA 02110

Respondent Attorney

Jason C. Weida

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - MA

1 Courthouse Way, Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Antone Moniz re #6 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241, of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#7

(#7) Assented to MOTION to Seal Document #6 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241, Exhibit D, Declaration of Marcia Norat (Doc. # 6-4) by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

6 #5

Exhibit E

6 #4

*Restricted*

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) RESPONSE/ANSWER to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Weida, Jason) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/30/2020) (McDonagh, Christina). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Weida on behalf of Antone Moniz (Weida, Jason) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later 2pm on Thursday July 30th, 2020.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#3

(#3) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Antone Moniz re #6 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241, of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to MOTION to Seal Document #6 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241, Exhibit D, Declaration of Marcia Norat (Doc. # 6-4) (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Assented to MOTION to Seal Document #6 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241, Exhibit D, Declaration of Marcia Norat (Doc. # 6-4) by Antone Moniz.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE/ANSWER to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Weida, Jason) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/30/2020) (McDonagh, Christina). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Weida on behalf of Antone Moniz (Weida, Jason) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later 2pm on Thursday July 30th, 2020.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8345935 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Cesar Peloso Benitez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Medrano Santana, Oriosto) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less