This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2020 at 09:06:35 (UTC).

Peleus Insurance Company v. B.P. Fisher Law Group, LLP et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Peleus Insurance Company filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against B P Fisher Law Group, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01842

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Peleus Insurance Company

Defendants and Debtors

B.P. Fisher Law Group, LLP

Matthew Browndorf

Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

BP Peterman Legal Group, LLC

Shannon Kreshtool

Plutos Sama LLC

Andrew Corcoran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew B Downs

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

101 Montgomery Street Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104-4146

Linda B Oliver

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

101 Montgomery Street Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 8 served on 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court&s Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

6 #1

Proof of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw Reference filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company. (November 30, 2020) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter to District Judge John A. Kronstadt. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company, identifying Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Peleus Insurance Company. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (SPS Counterclaim)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (Adversary Proceeding Complaint)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 8:20-ap-01100-TA to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 8:19-bk-10158-TA Receipt No: ACACDC-28223222 - Fee: $181, filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Adversary Proceeding Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (SPS Counterclaim)) (Attorney Andrew B Downs added to party Peleus Insurance Company(pty:bkmov))(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 8 served on 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#8) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE (DKT. 6) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion to Withdraw Reference from November 30, 2020 to March 29, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Courts Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court&s Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw Reference filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company. (November 30, 2020) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter to District Judge John A. Kronstadt. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company, identifying Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Peleus Insurance Company. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 8:20-ap-01100-TA to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 8:19-bk-10158-TA Receipt No: ACACDC-28223222 - Fee: $181, filed by plaintiff Peleus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Adversary Proceeding Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (SPS Counterclaim)) (Attorney Andrew B Downs added to party Peleus Insurance Company(pty:bkmov))(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plutos Sama, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BP Fisher Law Group, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Peleus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant